Harrington v. Oasis Financial Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: David Harrington
Defendant: Oasis Financial Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv00783
Filed: April 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 12/6/10. Pltf is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing to be filed no later than 4:00 p.m. on 1/4/10, why sanctions should not be imposed a gainst him and/or his counsel. The Status Conference is hereby CONT'D to 1/18/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. A status report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to the status conference. (Kastilahn, A)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 9/13/10, ORDERING the Status Conference CONT'D to 12/13/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/16/10 ORDERING that the Status Conference is continued to 9/20/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A joint status report is due 14 days prior. Further, if pltf fails to amend his complaint and/or file a motion for entry of default judgment, he shall explain in his status report why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Owen, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. Oasis Financial Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Financial Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Harrington
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?