Adams v. Swarthout

Defendant: Gary Swarthout
Petitioner: Steven Adams
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Case Number: 2:2010cv00787
Filed: April 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/24/2011 RECOMMENDING that the 1 petition be denied. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/28/2011 ORDERING that all prior filing deadlines are VACATED; the parties have 21 days to provide simultaneous supplemental briefing, in light of the very recent decision noted in this order, demonstrating why the instant petition should not be dismissed.(Yin, K)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 [VACATED- See 18 Clerks Notice] ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 01/27/11 ordering the parties have 21 days to provide sumultaneous supplemental briefing, in light of the very recent decision noted above, demonstrating why the instant petition should not be dismissed. The court will not look with favor upon requests for extensions of time. (Plummer, M) Modified on 1/27/2011 (Donati, J).
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/10/10 DENYING 13 Motion to Dismiss ; ADOPTING in Full 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Respondent shall file an answer to the petition within sixty days of the filed date of this order.(Williams, D)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/20/10 recommending that respondent's 07/21/10 motion to dismiss 13 be denied; and respondent shall file an answer to the petition within 60 days of these findings and recommendations being adopted. MOTION to DISMISS 13 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?