In re SK Foods, L.P.
Defendant: Scott Salyer, The Scott Salyer Revocable Trust and Salyer Management Company, LLC
Appellee: Bradley D. Sharp
Appellant: SK PM Corp, SKF Canning, LLC, Blackstone Ranch Corporation, Monterey Peninsula Farms, LLC, SK Farms Services, LLC, SK Frozen Foods, LLC, SS Farms, LLC, SSC Farming, LLC, SSC Farms I, LLC, SSC Farms II, LLC and SSC Farms III, LLC
Debtor: SK Foods, LP
Trustee: Office of the US Trustee (Sac)
Case Number: 2:2010cv00810
Filed: April 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 06/12/12 ORDERING that cases 2:12-cv-1292-GEB, 2:10-cv-810-LKK, 2:10-cv-811-LKK and 2:10-cv-812-LKK are RELATED.(Benson, A.)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/4/12 ORDERING that this case be related to case number 2:12-cv-1308 JAM and that the related case be REASSIGNED to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton for all further proceedings. The Clerk shall make the appropriate adjustments in the case assignment. (Meuleman, A)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/13/2012 Related case(s) with; 2:10-CR-61 LKK, 2:10-CV-810 LKK, 2:12-CV-669 LKK, 2:12-CV-775 LKK; REASSIGNING CASE(s) 2:12-CV-655 GEB and 2:12-CV-894 JAM to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton for all further proceedings. New Case Numbers: 2:12-CV-655 LKK, 2:12-CV-894 LKK.(Reader, L)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/29/12 ORDERING that this case be related to case number 2:12-CV-669 MCE and that the related case be reassigned to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton for all further proceedings. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as Civ. No. 2:12-cv-669 LKK. The Clerk shall make the appropriate adjustments in the case assignment. (Meuleman, A)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/19/11 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:10-CV-3467 MCE is reassigned to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton for all further proceedings. Henceforth the caption on all documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as No. 2:10-CV-3467-LKK. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Becknal, R)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REMANDING CASE to USBC Eastern District of California signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/9/10. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Manzer, C)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/23/10 ORDERING actions 2:10-cv-2912 WBS, 2:10-CV-2913 FCD, AND 2:10-CV-2914 MCE are REASSIGNED to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton for all further proceedings; the caption on all documents filed in the reassigned cases shall now be known as 2:10-cv-2912, 2:10-cv-2913 LKK, and 2:10-cv-2914 LKK; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of these case to compensate for this reassignment.(Carlos, K)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/26/10 ORDERING that the deadline to file proposed order resolving appeals and related motions is extended to 10/29/10. (Owen, K)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/13/2010. Court orders parties to file Proposed Order, as described in document text, by 10/26/2010. (Marciel, M)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/16/10 ORDERING that the bankruptcy appeal shall be heard on 10/12/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Manzer, C)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/8/10 ORDERING that the actions denominated 2:10-CV-1492-FCD; 2:10-CV-1493-GEB; 2:10-CV-1496-WBS;2:10-CV-1497-GEB; 2:10-CV-1498-WBS; 2:10-CV-1499-WBS; and 2:10-CV-1500-MCE are reassigned to Judge L awrence K. Karlton for all further proceedings. Henceforth the caption on all documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as No. 2:10-CV-1492-LKK; 2:10-CV-1493-LKK; 2:10-CV-1496-LKK; 2:10-CV-1497-LKK;2:10-CV-1498-LKK; 2:10-CV-1499-LKK; and 2:10-CV-1500-LKK. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re SK Foods, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bradley D. Sharp
Represented By: Gregory C Nuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Salyer
Represented By: Paul Joseph Pascuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Scott Salyer Revocable Trust
Represented By: Paul Joseph Pascuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salyer Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SK PM Corp
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SKF Canning, LLC
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Blackstone Ranch Corporation
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Monterey Peninsula Farms, LLC
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SK Farms Services, LLC
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SK Frozen Foods, LLC
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SS Farms, LLC
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SSC Farming, LLC
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SSC Farms I, LLC
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SSC Farms II, LLC
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SSC Farms III, LLC
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: SK Foods, LP
Represented By: Larry J Lichtenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the US Trustee (Sac)
Represented By: Judith C. Hotze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?