October 29, 2014 |
Filing
90
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/28/14 recommending that defendant's motion for summary judgment 86 be granted. Plaintiff's retaliation claim against defendant Lynn be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies prior to filing suit; and this action be closed. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 86 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
April 22, 2014 |
Filing
85
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/21/14 ORDERING that 78 Motion to Dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies prior to filing suit 78 is DENIED without prejudice to the filing of a motion for summary judgment in accordance with Albino within thirty days; and Defendants request for clarification from the court on the effect of the decision in Albino on the pending unenumerated Rule 12(b) motion to dismiss 83 is GRANTED. (Dillon, M)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
80
ORDER denying 79 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/24/14. (Plummer, M)
|
February 7, 2014 |
Filing
77
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/06/14 vacating 71 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS anddenying 63 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice to refiling within 30 days in accordance with the instructions provided herein. Alternatively, defendant Lynn may file an answer to the complaint. (Plummer, M)
|
December 23, 2013 |
Filing
73
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/20/13 ordering that within 14 days of the date of this order defendant Lynn shall file a reply to plaintiff's objections and show cause as to why plaintiff should not be excused from complying with the exhaustion requirement in light of his objections, sworn declaration and exhibits. Alternative defendant Lynn may move to withdraw the pending motion to dismiss. (Plummer, M)
|
October 23, 2013 |
Filing
71
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/23/13 RECOMMENDING that 63 MOTION to DISMISS be granted; and this action be closed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
April 17, 2013 |
Filing
66
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/16/13 denying Motions to Appoint Counsel 64 , 65 . (Plummer, M) Modified on 4/17/2013 (Plummer, M).
|
March 29, 2013 |
Filing
61
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/29/13 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 3/7/13 59 are ADOPTED in full; The Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order of 3/29/12 46 is DENIED; The Motion to Amend or Supplement Plaintiff's pleading 51 is DENIED. The Motion to Dismiss 55 is DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
March 7, 2013 |
Filing
59
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/6/13 ORDERING that defendants July 13, 2012 request for an extension of time (Doc. No. 53 ) is granted nunc pro tunc; It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs April 9, 20 12 motion for reconsideration (Doc. No. 46 ) of the courts March 29, 2012 order be denied; Plaintiffs May 21, 2012 motion to amend or supplement his amended pleading (Doc. No. 51 ) be denied; and Defendants August 30, 2012 motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 55 ) be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
March 29, 2012 |
Filing
44
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/29/2012 ADOPTING 18 Findings and Recommendations in full. This action shall proceed on plaintiff's first amended retaliation claim again defendant Lynn. Plaintiff's due process claims again defendants Lynn, Kelly, Hale, Martinez and Kahn are DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's claims again defendants Statti and McDonald are DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim. (Donati, J)
|
March 26, 2012 |
Filing
43
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/26/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs various motions for leave to supplement his complaint 26 , 28 , 30 , 34 and 37 are denied without prejudice to raising the proposed new causes of action in a se parate civil action; Plaintiffs motions for a temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunctive relief 27 & 29 are denied as moot; Plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunctive relief 42 is denied without prejudice; and Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel 31 is denied. (Dillon, M)
|
September 23, 2010 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/22/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 21 motion for an "informal restraining order" is DENIED as premature. (Yin, K)
|
August 26, 2010 |
Filing
18
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/25/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 17 motion to supplement his amended cmplt is GRANTED; and RECOMMENDING that this action proceed on pltf's First Amendment re taliation claim against dft Lynn; pltf's due process claims against dfts Lynn, Kelly, Hale, Martinez and Kahn be dismissed w/ prejudice; pltf's claims against dft Statti be dismissed w/ prejudice; and pltf's claims against dft McDonald be dismissed w/ prejudice. Referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.; Objections due w/in 21 days.(Yin, K)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 5/21/2010 ORDERING 10 that, upon reconsideration, the order of the magistrate judge is AFFIRMED. (Reader, L)
|
April 29, 2010 |
Filing
12
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/29/2010 DENYING 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Reader, L)
|