Gladkihk v. National City Mortgage, et al.,
Plaintiff: Lina Gladkihk
Defendant: National City Mortgage Co., PNC Mortgage Corporation, Green Tree Servicing, LLC and Fannie Mae
Case Number: 2:2010cv00852
Filed: April 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/26/11 ORDERING dfts' motion to dismiss pltf's second amended comlaint 31 is GRANTED; pltf's TILA claim is dismissed without leave to amend and therefore the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and the Clerk is ordered to close the case. CASE CLOSED. (Carlos, K)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/17/2010 GRANTING 19 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend; within 10 days from the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed, Plaintiff's counsel shall either personally pay sanctions in the amount of $250 to the Clerk of the Court, or show good cause for the failure to comply with LR 230(c). Pltf may file an amended complaint not later than 20 days after the date this Memorandum and Order is filed electronically. If no amended complaint is filed within said 20 day period, without further notice, Pltf's claims will be dismissed without leave to amend. (Reader, L)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/9/2010 GRANTING 20 that defendants request to appear telephonically is APPROVED. (Reader, L)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/22/10, DENYING 9 pltf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Pltf may file an amended complaint not later than 20 days after the date this Memorandum and Order is filed electronically. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gladkihk v. National City Mortgage, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Gladkihk
Represented By: Piotr Gabriel Reysner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Mortgage Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?