Meador v. C.S.P. Dental Annex et al
Plaintiff: |
William L. Meador |
Defendant: |
C.S.P. Dental Annex, Jennings, Crispin and F. Zhang |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv00860 |
Filed: |
April 12, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Solano |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 26, 2012 |
Filing
61
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/26/2012 DENYING plaintiff's 57 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
|
November 10, 2011 |
Filing
48
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/9/2011 ORDERING the clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that defendants' 37 motion for summary judgment be granted; judgment be entered in their favor; and the clerk be directed to close the case. Assigned and Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
June 21, 2011 |
Filing
35
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/20/11 ordering plaintiff's 11/02/10 request to file documents 22 is granted as provided in this order. Plaintiff's 04/27/11 motion to supplement the motion for a preliminary injunct ion 32 is granted. Plaintiff's 12/20/10 motion for a preliminary injunction 23 is construed as a motion for protective order and, so construed, is denied. Plaintiff's 12/20/10 motion for relief from bond 24 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's 05/11/11 motion to schedule pretrial proceedings 33 is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
30
ORDER denying 28 Motion for a physical examination signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/20/11. (Plummer, M)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/2/10 ORDERING that 19 request for a copy of the docket is granted, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the docket. (Dillon, M)
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing
17
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by United States Marshal without prepayment of costs signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/26/2010. The clerk is directed to forward the instructions for service, the completed summons, four copies of the 3/2/2010 complaint, consent forms and copies of this order to the USM. The clerk is further directed to send copy of the complaint and Local Rules to the plaintiff. Within 14 days from the date of this order, the USM shall notify defendants Drs. Jennings, Crispin, and Zhang of the commencement of this action and request a waiver of service of summons. (Donati, J)
|
October 7, 2010 |
Filing
12
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/7/10 ORDERING that plaintiff has 20 days from the date of this order either to explain his failure to comply with the September 15, 2010 order, or to submit four copies of his complaint. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff one copy of the March 2, 2010 pleading.(Dillon, M)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing
10
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of William L. Meador signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/15/2010. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?