Alfaro v. Scott

Plaintiff: Mika Christina Alfaro
Defendant: Mark Scott
Case Number: 2:2010cv00892
Filed: April 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/1/2010 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(b), based on pltf's failure to prosecute the action; and the clerk of the court be directed to close this case; Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/18/2010 ORDERING 4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are adopted; Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is denied; plaintiff is given 30 days in which to pay the filing fee; and failure to pay the filing fee will result in a recommendation of dismissal by the magistrate judge. (Matson, R)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/17/2010 recommending that plt's application to proceed in forma pauperis be denied and that plaintiff be given thirty days in which to pay the filing fee of $350. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Duong, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfaro v. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mika Christina Alfaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?