Shavers v. Clark, et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Lee Shavers, Jr.
Defendant: D. Clark, T. Robertson and N. Grannis
Case Number: 2:2010cv01001
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 54 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/12/13. (Kaminski, H)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/18/12 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 11/18/11 38 are ADOPTED in full; The Motion for Injunction 32 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/28/2011 RECOMMENDING that the 13 motion to dismiss be granted. This case be closed. Motion referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Zignago, K.)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/18/11 recommending that the motion for an injunction 32 be denied. MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 32 referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/2/10 ORDERING that within thirty days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion to dismiss or a statement of nonopposition. (Dillon, M)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/14/10 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect an initial partial filing fee of $6.33 and thereafter, forward payment from the prison trust account of Jesse Lee Shavers, Jr. to the clerk until the balance of $343.67 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shavers v. Clark, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Lee Shavers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?