Kozak et al v. Chabad-Lubavitch Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aria Kozak and Donna Kozak
Defendant: Chabad-Lubavitch Inc., Chabad of California, Chabad Running Springs Residential Camp, Chabad Cheder Menachem, Yeshiva Ohr Elchonon Chabad, Bais Chana High School, Chabad of the Marina, Chabad of Malibu and Chabad of Beverlywood
Intervenor_plaintiff: USA and State of California
Case Number: 2:2010cv01056
Filed: April 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER TERMINATING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/2/2019 IT IS SO ORDERED The Writ of Garnishment issued in this case against Chabad of California is hereby TERMINATED pursuant to 28:3205(c)(10)(C). (Reader, L)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/2/2016 ORDERING the Court hereby ORDERS, ADJUDGES and DECREES the United States' application for a final order of garnishment in the amount of $1,267.00 is GRANTED; Comerica Bank shall deliver to the US Dept of Justice, within 20 days ofthe filing of this Order, a cashier's check, money order or company draft in the sum of $1,267.00 drawn from defendant Chabad of California's business checking account numbers x-3769 and x-0486 and made payable to the "United States Department of Justice" at the United States' Attorney's Office, Eastern District of CA (Attn: Tina Baca), 501 I Street, Suite 10-100, Sacramento, CA 95814; Comerica Bank shall st ate the docket number (Case No.: 2:10-cv-01056-MCE-EFB) on the payment instrument and, if it desires a payment receipt, shall include a self-addressed, stamped envelope with the payment; Upon its payment of the $1,267.00 to the US, Comerica Bank shall release its hold on Chabad of California's business checking account numbers x-3769 and x-0486; and this is a final order of garnishment; upon payment and processing of the garnished amount as ordered above, this writ shall terminate pursuant to 28:3205(c)(10)(B). (Reader, L)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 AMENDED JUDGMENT dated *10-14-2015* pursuant to order signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/13/2015. (Zignago, K.)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/5/15 ORDERING the Court, having reviewed the court files and the United States' Application for an Order Directing Entry of Judgment, hereby GRANTS the Application; Accordingly, the Clerk is hereby directed to ENTER judgment in favor of the plaintiff United States and against the defendant Chabad of California in the amount of $712,090, plus interest as allowed by law. (Becknal, R)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/20/15 ORDERING that Pursuant to the parties' signed stipulation 138 and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Defendants Chabad-Lubavitch Inc., Yeshiva Ohr Elchonon Chabad, Bais Chana High School, Chab ad of Marina, and Bais Chaya Mushka, and the cross-claims of Yeshiva Ohr Elchonon against Chabad of California, are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice and without the loss of any rights, claims, or remedies. All other parties and claims not dismissed above remain in the case. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/8/2015 GRANTING 78 Motion for Summary Judgment in favor of the Government and againgst Defendant Chabad of California; AWARDING treble damages against Chabad of Califo rnia in the sum of $821,610.00, along with statutory penalties in the amount of $27,500.00, for a total of $849,110.00; DENYING 78 Motion for Summary Judgment insofar as it applies to Defendants Chabad of Marina and Yeshiva Ohr. (Michel, G.)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/15/15 ORDERING that within 10 days the parties shall file a supplemental joint status report. (Benson, A)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/10/15 ORDERING that within 30 days of the filing of this Order, the parties shall file a supplemental joint status report advising the Court of the status of the settlement agreement, and what, if any, additional issues remain for resolution in the case.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/2/15 ORDERING the Court, having reviewed the court files and the parties' Joint Status Report, hereby orders that within 30 days of the date this Order is electronically filed, the parti es shall either file or lodge dispositive documents resolving the remaining issues in this case, or file a supplemental report advising the Court of any additional issues remaining in dispute and their proposal for resolving those matters. (Becknal, R)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/8/2014 GRANTING 78 Motion for Summary Judgment against Chabad of California; AWARDING $817,485.00 in treble damages along with $27,500.00 in statutory penalties, fo r a total of $844,985.00 against Defendant Chabad of California; DENYING 78 Motion for Summary Judgment as it applies to Defendants Chabad of Marina, Yeshiva Ohr; VACATING the Final Pretrial Conference, Jury Trial in this matter; DIRECTING the remaining parties to file a Joint Status Report within thirty (30) days. (Michel, G)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/9/2014. The Jury Trial is VACATED and CONTINUED to 1/20/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE). Trial Briefs shall be filed no later than 11/20/2014. Final Pretrial Conference is RE-SET for 12/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE). The Joint Final Pretrial Statement due no later than 11/13/2014. Any Evidentiary or Procedural Motions to be filed by 11/13/2014; Oppositions due by 11/2014; and any Replies shall be submitted by 11/26/2014. (Marciel, M)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/22/2014 ORDERING that any opposition or cross motions to the pending 78 motion for summary judgment are to be filed no later than 7/24/2014, and any reply and cross motion o pposition papers are to be filed no later than 8/7/2014. No other dates or deadlines in this Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order are altered. Reply briefing, if any, to a cross-motion remains due at least one week prior to the 8/21/14 hearing. (Zignago, K.)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/24/14 GRANTING 75 Request to Either Authorize Multiple Briefs in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Extend the Page Limitation for the Brief in Support of Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that the page limitation for the United States' memorandum of points and authorities, to be filed 6/26/14, in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment, shall be 30 pages. (Meuleman, A)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/18/14. Defendant Chabad of California shall reimburse the United States in the amount of $900.00. (Manzer, C)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/29/14; substituting Mark M. Hathaway as counsel of Chabad of California in place of Jeffrey G. Jacobs; MOOTING 66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Meuleman, A)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER re: 61 signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/14/13 VACATING Settlement Conference scheduled for 11/18/13. The parties shall SUBMIT a joint request for a new Settlement Conference date following the completion of discovery. (Meuleman, A)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/5/13 ORDERNG that the United States's 58 motion to compel defendant Chabad of California to provide its initial disclosures and to respond to the United States' First Set of Inter rogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents is GRANTED. Within seven days of the date of this order, defendant Chabad of California shall serve the United States with its initial disclosures. Also within seven days of the d ate of this order, defendant Chabad of California shall serve the United States with responses to its First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents. Within seven days of the date of this order, the United States shall file a declaration identifying the reasonable expenses incurred in making its motion to compel. Any response to the declaration shall be filed within seven days thereafter. Defendant Chabad of California is admonished that failure to comply with this order and/or continued failures to comply with the Local Rules and/or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure may result in the imposition of further sanctions, including monetary sanctions, evidentiary sanctions, and/or rendering a default judgment against defendant Chabad of California. (Kastilahn, A)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/10/13: Settlement Conference reset for 11/18/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Manzer, C)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/20/12 ORDERING that the following causes of action of the complaint, filed April 30, 2010, shall be dismissed without prejudice as to all defendants: (i) Count IV, California False Claims Act (Government Code § 12651(a)(1) and (a)(2)) (Complaint, 17:24-18:24); (ii) Count V, California False Claims Act (Government Code § 12651(a)(3)) (Complaint, 18:25-19:28); (iii) Count VI, California False Claims Act (Government Code § 12651(a)(7)) (Complaint, 20:1-21:1); (iv) Count VII, Breach of Contract (Complaint, 21:2-16); and (v) Count VIII, Unjust Enrichment (Complaint, 21:17-22:2). (Manzer, C)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/5/12 ORDERING that the following causes of action of the complaint, filed 4/30/10, shall be dismissed without prejudice as to all defendants: (i) Count IV, California False Claims Act (Government Code § 12651(a)(1) and (a)(2)) (Complaint, 17:24-18:24); (ii) Count V, California False Claims Act (Government Code § 12651(a)(3)) (Complaint, 18:25-19:28); (iii) Count VI, California False Claims Act (Government Code § 12651(a)(7)) (Complaint, 20:1- 21:1); (iv) Count VII, Breach of Contract (Complaint, 21:2-16); and (v) Count VIII, Unjust Enrichment (Complaint, 21:17-22:2). (Becknal, R).
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/17/2012 ORDERING that the complaint be UNSEALED and served upon the defendants by the United States. All other contents of the Court's file in this action remain under seal and not be made public or served upon the defendants, except for this Order and the United States' Notice of Election to Intervene which will be served upon the defendants after service of the complaint. The seal be lifted as to all matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. The defendants respond to the complaint within 20 days after being served. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozak et al v. Chabad-Lubavitch Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aria Kozak
Represented By: Leslie Sindelar Guillon
Represented By: Michael Andrew Hirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Kozak
Represented By: Leslie Sindelar Guillon
Represented By: Michael Andrew Hirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chabad-Lubavitch Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chabad of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chabad Running Springs Residential Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chabad Cheder Menachem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yeshiva Ohr Elchonon Chabad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bais Chana High School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chabad of the Marina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chabad of Malibu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chabad of Beverlywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Glen Frederick Dorgan, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Nicklas A. Akers
Represented By: Jacqueline Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?