Herrera v. Statti
Plaintiff: Roberto Herrera
Defendant: P. Statti
Case Number: 2:2010cv01154
Filed: May 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/30/2016 ADVISING plaintiff that further documents filed by plaintiff in this case will be disregarded and no orders will issue in response to future filings. Plaintiff is also advised that if he seeks the appointment of counsel for his appeal, he should direct that request to the Ninth Circuit. (Yin, K)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 2/25/16 ORDERING that this action shall remain closed. (Kastilahn, A)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/21/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 197 ) is DENIED. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/10/15 ordering plaintiff's requests and motions for relief pursuant to rule 56(d) 174 , 181 , 183 , 185 , 186 , 187 , 189 , 190 , 191 are denied. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff' shall file an opposition to defendant Medina's motion for summary judgment. No further extensions of time will be granted for this purpose. Defendant's motion to strike 188 is denied. (Plummer, M)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/27/15 ordering plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 172 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 172 is denied. (Plummer, M)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/5/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 170 motion for a court order; within 14 days, defense counsel shall re-serve on plaintiff defendant Medina's requests for admission; and within 14 day of the date of service of Medina's requests for admission, plaintiff shall re-serve on defense counsel his responses to the defendant's discovery requests. Plaintiff's responses must be signed. (Yin, K)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/29/15 denying 141 Motion for supplemental sanctions. Plaintiff's opposition to defendants motion for summary judgment, construed as a motion to withdraw or amend his admissions pursuant to rule 36(b) 162 is granted. Within 21 days of the date of service of this order, plaintiff shall reserve his responses to defendant Medina's request for admission. Plaintiff's responses must be signed. Defendant Medina's motion for summary judgment 121 is deemed withdrawn. Defendant Medina is granted 120 days from the date of this order to file a motion for summary judgment on the merits of the case. (Plummer, M)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/07/15 ordering that within 14 days of the date of this order, defendant Medina shall show cause as to why the court should not grant plaintiff's motion to withdraw or amend his admissions. Alternatively, defendant Medina may elect to voluntarily withdraw the pending motion for summary judgment without prejudice to renewing it on the merits. (Plummer, M)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/4/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 134 , 145 motions for relief pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(d); plaintiff shall file an opposition to defendant Medina's motion for summary judgment within 60 days; plaintiff's 144 , 148 motions for appointment of counsel are DENIED; and plaintiff's 148 motion for appointment of an expert is DENIED. (Yin, K)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 09/03/14 plaintiff's motions for reconsideration 81 , 116 , and 125 are denied. (Plummer, M)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/29/14 DENYING 117 Motion for Reconsideration; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 120 Motion for Sanctions; STRIKING AS UNTIMELY 122 Motion to Compel and 132 Motion to Compel; DENYING 129 Motion to Strike ; and STRIKING AS UNTIMELY 133 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Meuleman, A)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/24/14 granting 97 Motion to Compel. Within 30 days of the date of service of this order, plaintiff shall serve on defense counsel further responses to defendant's special interrogatories ( set one) and request for production of documents (set one) Defendant's requests for terminating sanctions and monetary sanctions 97 are denied without prejudice. Defendants's motion for terminating sanctions based on plaintiff's failure to cooperate with discovery 102 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff shall cooperate with defendse counsel in the taking of his deposition. (Plummer, M)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/28/14 denying 98 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/07/14 ordering that Shanan L. Hewitt of the Law Offices of Rivera and Associates is sbustituted in on case number 2:10-cv-1154 MCE DAD P and Michelle Domingo, Deputy Attorney General, is substituted out of said case as attorney of record for defendant D. Medina. (Plummer, M)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 89 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/19/13. (Plummer, M)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/3/2013 DENYING plaintiff's 83 motion for a medical examination brought pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 35; DENYING plaintiff's 84 motion for a court order requiring that officials at CSP Corcoran provide him with requested medical care; and DENYING plaintiff's 85 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying 44 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/17/13. (Plummer, M)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/12/2013 DENYING 76 , 78 Motions to Appoint Counsel; ADOPTING, in full, 75 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING 45 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING Defendants B. Wheeler, K. Clement, J. M icone, W. Harrison; REFERRING this matter back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on Plaintiffs sole remaining claim that defendant Medina failed to provide him with adequate medical care in violation of the Eighth Amendment. (Michel, G)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/8/13 ORDERING that plaintiffs motions for preliminary injunctive relief (Doc. Nos. 46 & 52 ) are DENIED as moot. It is RECOMMENDED that defendants motion to d ismiss (Doc. No. 45 ) be granted; Defendants Wheeler, Clement, Micone, and Harrison be dismissed from this action; and this matter be referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings on plaintiffs sole remaining claim that defendant Medina failed to provide him with adequate medical care in violation of the Eighth Amendment. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/18/2013 GRANTING plaintiff's 68 motion for an extension of time; within 30 days, plaintiff shall file his supplemental opposition; DENYING plaintiff's 65 motion for the court to mail a letter from him to the Office of the Federal Defender, or alternatively plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel; and DENYING plaintiff's 66 request for a court order. (Yin, K)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/02/13 ordering plaintiff's discovery motion 50 is granted in part. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to review his central file and submit a supplmental opposition if he so desires. Within 14 days of service of plaintiff's supplemental opposition, if any, defendants may file a response thereto. (Plummer, M)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/14/2013 DENYING plaintiff's 49 , 61 motions for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/3/12 denying 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/23/12 ordering that plaintiff's request to add additional allegations to his amended complaint 37 is denied. (Plummer, M)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/5/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 6/15/11 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel 32 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/21/11 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of his 19 amendedcomplaint; Within 14 days from the date of service of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Submission of Documents and submit it to the court, together with his signed amended complaint. Plaintiffs motions for appointment of counsel 23 , 24 are DENIED; and Plaintiffs 26 motion for a court order is DENIED.(Dillon, M)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Robert Herrera signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/3/2010. CDC is to collectmonthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/8/10 DENYING 3 and 10 Motions to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/14/10 DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP without prejudice; Clerk is directed to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner for use in a civil rights action; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided with this order. (Dillon, M)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/10/2010. New Case Number 2:10-cv-01154-DAD (PC). Old Case Number 1:10-cv-00795-MJS (PC). (Bradley, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Statti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Statti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?