Griley v. National City Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Paul Griley
Defendant: National City Mortgage, Green Tree Servicing, LLC, PNC Mortgage Corporation, Fannie Mae and National City Bank of Indiana
Case Number: 2:2010cv01204
Filed: May 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/22/2012 DISMISSING CASE pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 41(a)(1). Each party waives any claim for attorneys fees or costs. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/18/2011 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this Order, plaintiff shall file a brief to show cause why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to FRCP 42(b) for failure to prosecu te; pltf shall file a status report as required by the Court's Status Pretrial Scheduling Conference Order 5 ; Scheduling Conference is continued to 4/18/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb; Counsel for pltf shall personally attend the conference. (Reader, L)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/18/11 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 18 Motion to Dismiss; pltf may proceed under first amended complaint and the remaining claims OR may amend the complaint to cure the defects within 20 days. (Manzer, C)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/13/10 ORDERING that defendants' motion to dismiss the Complaint as against Fannie Mae be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED; defendants' motion to dismiss the Co mplaint as against Green Tree is GRANTED as to plaintiff's claims for violations of the UCL, Fair Credit Reporting Act, and breach of contract/anticipatory repudiation and DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiff has 20 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint, if he can do so consistent with this Order. (Becknal, R)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/9/2010 ORDERING that defendants' 12 request to appear telephonically is approved.(Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griley v. National City Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Griley
Represented By: Piotr Gabriel Reysner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fannie Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Bank of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?