Chess v. Dovey, et al
Petitioner: Michael Chess
Respondent: J. Dovey, T. Felker and R. Quezada
Case Number: 2:2010cv01260
Filed: May 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/11/2011 ORDERING the clerk to designate this case as "closed" pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A). CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/3/10 ORDERING that the 12 First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. By separate order, the court will order that the original complaint be served with the completed service documents submitted by plaintiff. (Owen, K)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Michael Chess signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/21/2010. CDC is to collect monthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/28/10 ORDERING that Clerk of Court designate this case as a prisoner civil rights case under 42U.S.C. § 1983; Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complet ed information pauperis application and a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. Plaintiffs failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chess v. Dovey, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Chess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Dovey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Quezada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?