California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Gustafson Auto Wrecking And Towing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
California Sportfishing Protection Alliance |
Defendant: |
Gustafson Auto Wrecking And Towing, Inc., Dale Gustafson and Dan Gustafson |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv01408 |
Filed: |
June 8, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Shasta |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
33 U.S.C. ยง 1319 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 6, 2014 |
Filing
67
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/6/14. The Court VACATES the civil penalty of $37,500 awarded by the Court on 5/31/13 re 58 Minute Order. Defendants have fully and timely complied with the terms set forth in the Order of 5/31/13 to the satisfaction of the parties and the Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
September 11, 2013 |
Filing
64
STIPULATED CONDITIONAL REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL AND TO STAY CIVIL PENALTY AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/10/13. Attorney Michael E. Vinding is substituted as counsel for defendants Gustafson Auto Wrecking and Towing, Inc., Dale Gustafson and Dan Gustafson, in place of Attorney Jeffory J. Scharff. The Court hereby STAYS enforcement of the civil penalty of $37,500 until 1/1/2014. If Defendants do not fully and timelycomply with the terms set forth in this order, the Court shall reinstate the award upon receipt of notice of noncompliance with those terms from Plaintiff's counsel. If Defendants comply with the terms set forth in this order, the Court will vacate the civil penalty. (Kastilahn, A)
|
July 12, 2011 |
Filing
51
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/11/11: This case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
|
March 31, 2011 |
Filing
43
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/31/11 ORDERING pursuant to tenative settlement agreement Counsel shall file a formal Notice of Settlement by April 15, 2011. If there is no objection to the settlement, the filing of final dispositional documents shall be completed within 75 days of the filing of the formal Notice of Settlement. All previously set dates in this matter are hereby vacated. Sanctions may be imposed for failure to comply with this Order. (Williams, D)
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/15/2011 DENYING 36 plaintiffs ex parte application for order shortening time. (Reader, L)
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/24/11 ORDERING that the Request for dismissal of Defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's First Amended Complant 15 , and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Civil Penalties 24 are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be granted leave to file the Second Amended Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
February 1, 2011 |
Filing
27
ORDER granting 14 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/1/2011 ORDERING that defendants shall allow plaintiff to conduct a "dry" inspection of defendants' facility consistent with plaintiff's second request as soon as practical, and in any case, no later than 30 days from the date of service of this order; defendants shall allow plaintiff to conduct "wet" inspections of defendants' facility consistent with plaintiff's first r equest, prior to termination of the General Permit's "Wet Season" on 3/31/11; defendant's counsel shall reimburse plaintiff in the amount of $13,772.55 to defray plaintiff's reasonable attorney's fees and costs and payment shall be made w/i 15 days from date of service of this order. (Waggoner, D)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?