Dekalb v. Marsh et al
Plaintiff: |
James Dekalb |
Defendant: |
Marsh, Cameron, Cullison, Gary R Stanton and Solano County Jail |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv01427 |
Filed: |
June 10, 2010 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Solano |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory G. Hollows |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 19, 2010 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 11/19/10 ORDERING the findings and recommendations are ADOPTED IN FULL; and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. (Carlos, K)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing
12
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/15/2010 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing
10
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/3/10 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to open a separate 28 U.S.C. § 2254 action for plaintiff; Assign the undersigned magistrate judge and make an appropriateadjustment in the assignment of § 2254 cases to compensate for such assignment;File and docket a copy of this order in the new separate habeas action; Place copy of the 9 petition, and a copy of this order in the additional separate file opened for this plaintiff; Send plaintiff an endorsed copy of his petition and a copy of this order both in this case and in the newly opened case. The new habeas case number is 2:10-cv-2063 GGH.(Dillon, M)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing
8
ORDER denying 6 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/20/10: The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Kaminski, H)
|
July 8, 2010 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/8/10 denying 4 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on t he form provided by the Clerk of Court; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint.(Dillon, M)
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/18/2010 ORDERING pltf to submit, w/in 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; the clerk to send pltf a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?