Bridgeman v. United State of America et al
Plaintiff: |
Harley S. Bridgeman, Jr. |
Defendant: |
United State of America, Fremont Bank and TD Service Company |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv01457 |
Filed: |
June 14, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Placer |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2671 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 3, 2011 |
Filing
92
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/2/11 DENYING 90 Motion to Stay. Motion is submitted without oral argument. (Manzer, C)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing
87
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/20/11 ORDERING that T.D. Service Company's Request for judicial Notice is GRANTED. Federal National Mortgage Association and Fremont Bank's Request for judicial notice is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by defendant T.D. Service Company 21 be granted. The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Fremont Bank and Federal National Mortgage Corporation 25 be granted. The Motion to dimsiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by defendant United States of America [5 6], which the Court construes a Motion for Judgment on the pleadings be granted in part. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 20 be dismissed with prejudice as to all defendants. This Case be closed and all dates in this matter be vacated. The se Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez. Within fourteen days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all partes. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
December 16, 2010 |
Filing
84
ORDER denying 79 Motion for Recusal signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/15/2010. (Duong, D)
|
October 12, 2010 |
Filing
54
ORDER denying as moot 50 Motion to Strike signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/8/10. (Kaminski, H)
|
October 4, 2010 |
Filing
52
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/1/10, ORDERING that the action denominated 2:10-cv-02619 LKK EFB (PS) be reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Kendall M. Newman for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in the reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:10-cv-02619 JAM-KJN (PS).(Kastilahn, A)
|
October 1, 2010 |
Filing
51
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/1/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 27 is STRIKEN. Defendant T.D. Service Company's MOTION to DISMISS the Second Amended Complaint 29 is DISREGARDED and Defend ant United States of America's answer to the Second Amended Complaint 31 is STRIKEN. Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint 32 is STRIKEN. Defendant T.D. Service Company's MOTION to DISMISS the Third Amended Complaint 44 is DISREGAR DED. The hearings in this matter presentrly set for the following dates are VACATED; 10/27/10 and 11/4/10. A hearing on the Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Firs Amended Complaint 21 , 25 shall be held on 11/18/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman in courtroom 25. If Plaintiff wishes to file an amended pleading, he must file a properly noticed MOTION for LEAVE an Amended Complaint pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(2). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing
12
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/23/2010 DENYING 11 Request from permission to use electronic filing is DENIED without prejudice. (Marciel, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?