August 20, 2012 |
Filing
65
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/17/12 ORDERING that plaintiffs request for appointment of counsel contained in his May 3, 2012 letter 57 is DENIED; and RECOMMENDING that 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Dillon, M)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing
61
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/18/12 ORDERING that the motion for summary judgment filed by defendants on September 23, 2011 48 is deemed re-noticed as of the filing date of this order, and shall be so designated on the doc ket by the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff is hereby informed of the requirements for opposing a motion for summary judgment (see order for further details). Within 21 days after the service date of this order, plaintiff may file an opposition to defendants motion for summary judgment. Within seven days after the date of service of the opposition, defendants may file a reply. The 59 findings and recommendations are VACATED.(Dillon, M)
|
May 30, 2012 |
Filing
59
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/29/12 denying 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' summary judgment motion 48 be granted. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 48 referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 21 days.(Plummer, M)
|
April 13, 2012 |
Filing
56
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/12/12 ORDERING that 53 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to file an opposition to defendants summary judgment motion; failure to file an opposition will be deemed a waiver of opposition. (Dillon, M)
|
September 22, 2011 |
Filing
47
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/20/2011 GRANTING defendants' 42 Motion to Compel. Within 28 days, plaintiff shall serve defendants with Supplemental Responses to at-issue Interrogatories. (Marciel, M)
|
June 29, 2011 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 06/28/11granting 37 Motion to vacate the dispositive motion deadline. The dispositive motion deadline is re-set for 09/23/11. (Plummer, M)
|
June 9, 2011 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/7/2011 ORDERING that dft's 27 motion to compel and for costs is DENIED w/out prejudice; and dft is GRANTED 21 days to serve pltf w/ one set of interrogatories and one set of request for production of documents in accordance w/ this order; pltf to respond w/in 21 days thereafter; dft may file a motion to compel, if appropriate, w/in 21 days thereafter. (Yin, K)
|
June 2, 2011 |
Filing
35
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/1/11 GRANTING 34 Motion to conduct the deposition of inmate Darrell Gurule via videoconference; Nothing in this order shall be interpreted as requiring any penal institution to obtain videoconferencing equipment if it is not already available. (Dillon, M)
|
May 20, 2011 |
Filing
33
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/19/11 GRANTING 26 Motion to modify the scheduling order; The discovery cut-off date is extended for 30 days from the date of this order so that defendants may depose plaintiffs newly identified inmate witness. (Dillon, M)
|
January 4, 2011 |
Filing
24
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/4/2011 ORDERING that that plaintiff's 23 December 27, 2010 motion for the appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Duong, D)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing
13
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Tri D. Nguyen signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/20/10. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing
6
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/22/2010 ORDERING that w/in 30 days, pltf to complete and return the Notice of Submission w/ the required documents; the clerk to send plf a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
|