Drobnaya v. Bank of America et al

Plaintiff: Alla Drobnaya and Aleksandr Drobnaya
Defendant: Bank of America, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Recontrust Company, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01579
Filed: June 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/16/10 ORDERING that the hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss, set for 11/18/10, is VACATED; and RECOMMENDING that Defendants' 7/7/10 motion to dismiss be GRANTED; and this action be DISMISSED. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/5/10 ORDERING that, within thirty days of the date of this order, plaintiffs shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss. Failure to file an opposition will be deemed as a statement of non-opposition and shall result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed pursuant Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b).(Becknal, R)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/10/10, ORDERING that the hearing date on dfts' motion to dismiss is CONT'D to 10/14/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26 before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. Pltf shall file opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss, no later than 9/30/10. (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drobnaya v. Bank of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alla Drobnaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleksandr Drobnaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: John Douglas Pingel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: John Douglas Pingel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: John Douglas Pingel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A.
Represented By: John Douglas Pingel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?