August 20, 2013 |
Filing
139
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/20/13 DENYING 132 Motion for Sanctions and DENYING 135 Request for Attorney Fees; RECOMMENDING that 118 MOTION to DISMISS filed by California Sport fishing Protection Alliance be granted and 123 MOTION to DISMISS filed by William Callaway be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Meuleman, A)
|
March 7, 2013 |
Filing
111
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/6/13 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 11/28/12, 102 are ADOPTED and Callaway's MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed 8/16/12 87 is DENIED; CalSpa's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed 9/20/12 93 is GRANTED as to Claims Three, Four and Six. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
January 15, 2013 |
Filing
107
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/15/2013 GRANTING 106 Motion for Extension of Time; ORDERING Defendant to file Objections to 102 Findings and Recommendations by 1/18/2013; ORDERING Plaintiff to file a Reply, if any, 14 days thereafter. (Michel, G)
|
November 28, 2012 |
Filing
102
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/27/2012 RECOMMENDING that Callaway's 87 motion for summary judgment be denied. CalSpa's 93 motion for partial summary judgment be granted as to Claims Three, Four and Six. Motions referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
|
August 22, 2012 |
Filing
92
STIPULATION and ORDER 87 signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/22/12 ORDERING the hearing for Motion for Summary Judgment is reset for 10/18/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Matson, R)
|
May 31, 2012 |
Filing
86
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 05/30/12 ORDERING that CalSpa's 79 Motion to Compel is GRANTED; CalSpa's First Set of Requests for Admissions, numbered 1-16, and 19-22, are deemed ADMITTED. CalSpa's request for monetary sanctions is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
|
May 9, 2012 |
Filing
81
ORDER denying 78 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/9/12. (Kaminski, H)
|
May 1, 2012 |
Filing
80
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/30/12 ADOPTING in full 74 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 55 Motion to Dismiss. (Meuleman, A)
|
April 11, 2012 |
Filing
77
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/10/12 GRANTING 76 Motion for Extension to file objections to 74 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS. Defendant is granted until 4/20/12 to file objections. Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. No further extensions will be approved. (Meuleman, A)
|
March 20, 2012 |
Filing
74
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/19/12 ORDERING that the 49 Motion to Compel is GRANTED; any request for sanctions is DENIED; RECOMMENDING that the 55 Motion to Dismiss be denied. Motion referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Manzer, C)
|
March 19, 2012 |
Filing
73
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/16/12: Non-expert discovery shall be completed by August 30, 2012. Expert discovery shall be completed by February 28, 2013. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/29/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. Trial set for 9/24/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
|
March 16, 2012 |
Filing
72
SUMMARY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/16/12: Plaintiff's motion to compel, filed November 14, 2011 is granted 49 . Defendant shall respond to the following discovery propounded by plaintiff by March 31, 2012. (Kaminski, H)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing
57
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 02/27/12 ORDERING that it is inappropriate to relate and reassign Civil No. S- 12-0443 MCEDAD to Civil No. S- 10-1801 GEB GGH PS per 56 Notice and it therefore DECLINES to do so. (Benson, A.)
|
December 6, 2011 |
Filing
52
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/05/11 ORDERING that the hearing on the 49 Motion to Compel is CONTINUED to 02/02/12 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Benson, A.)
|
November 17, 2011 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/16/11 ORDERING that plaintiff filed a discovery motion on 11/14/11 set for hearing on 12/15/11 @ 10:00 a.m. In accordance with the 7 days specified by E.D. Cal. L.R. 251, the joint stat ement shall be filed in no later than 7 days before the scheduled hearing. Pursuant to E.D. Cal. L.R. 133(f), if the joint statement is more than 25 pages, or the attachments are longer than 50 pages, the copy shall be hand delivered or sent by overnight mail to chambers on the day following the day of electronic filing. The filing deadline, accordingly, will be 12/8/11. (Becknal, R)
|
September 27, 2011 |
Filing
47
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/26/11 ORDERING that plaintiff's 16 motion to compel inspections is GRANTED. Defendant shall permit plaintiff to conduct a dry inspection of defendant's facility consistent with pla intiff's second request on any mutually agreeable weekday between 30 days from the date of service of this order on defendant and 12/31/11. Defendant shall permit plaintiff to conduct three wet inspections of defendant's facility consistent with plaintiff's third request, as mutually agreed upon, prior to 12/31/11. Plaintiff's request for expenses incurred in bringing this motion is DENIED; however, defendant is warned that any future failures to comply with the local rules of court or orders of the court will result in sanctions. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 9, 2011 |
Filing
46
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/9/2011 ORDERING 44 that the second settlement conference, scheduled for 9/13/2011 at 9:00 a.m., is VACATED. (Reader, L)
|
August 2, 2011 |
Filing
43
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/2/11, ORDERING that the Second Settlement Conference is CONT'D to 9/13/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Defendant shall submit his tax returns and other financial documents pursuant to this court's order of 7/21/11, to plaintiff no LATER than 8/5/11. (Kastilahn, A)
|
July 21, 2011 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/20/11 ORDERING Defendant William Callaway shall deliver to Plaintiff California Sportfishing Protection Alliance no later than two weeks from July 13, 2011, true and correct copies of his filed tax returns for thepast three years (i.e., 2008, 2009 and 2010), including the Schedule C report included in hisfiling of each of those tax returns. Additionally, Defendant shall deliver to Plaintiff no later than two weeks from July 13, 2011, true and correct copies of asset statements reflecting the current value of each of Defendant's assets (i.e., both real and personal property) valued in excess of one thousand dollars. The parties shall appear at a second Settlement Conference set for 8/2/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Matson, R)
|
July 18, 2011 |
Filing
40
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/18/2011. (Zignago, K.)
|
June 21, 2011 |
Filing
33
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/20/11 ORDERING that Defendant Callaway shall be permitted to withdraw Defendants' currently pending Motion For A Protective Order on 5/25/11, or as soon thereafter as may b e convenient for Defendant Callaway. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff California Sportfishing Protection Alliance shall be relieved of the obligation to file an Opposition brief in response to Defendants' currently pending Motion For A Prote ctive Order. Additionally, it is ORDERED that upon the Court's dismissal of Plaintiff's claims against defendants Harrison and Paradise Ready Mix, Inc. pursuant to stipulation of the Parties, that Defendant Callaway shall have leave to file an amended motion for protective order. Finally, it is ORDERED that Defendant Callaway's amended motion for protective order shall be set for hearing on a date at least twenty- eight (28) days subsequent to the Parties' settlement conference on 7/13/11. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
May 19, 2011 |
Filing
26
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 5/19/11, ORDERING that this case is referred to the assigned magistrate judge since defendants are proceeding in pro per. (Kastilahn, A)
|
May 2, 2011 |
Filing
23
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/2/11 ORDERING that Within twenty-one (21) days of this order, Plaintiff shall file an opposition to Defendants' motion for protective order. Defendants may file a reply seven days thereaft er. Plaintiff's MOTION to COMPEL inspections of land and property, filed 3/15/11 16 , and defendants motion for protective rder, filed 4/28/11 20 , are deferred pending completion of a settlement conference. An early settlement conference will be scheduled on either June 6, June 21, or July 13, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file notify the courtroom clerk, Valerie Callen, (916) 930-4199, of their selected date, within seven (7) days of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
March 23, 2011 |
Filing
18
AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/22/2011 ORDERING that the joint statement DDL will be 4/21/2011. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 17, 2011 |
Filing
17
STANDING 251 STIPULATED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/17/2011. (Marciel, M)
|
December 10, 2010 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 12/10/2010 DISCHARGING the 10 Order to Show Cause. (Donati, J)
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing
10
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/18/10: Defendant Paradise Ready Mix is Ordered to Show Cause in a writing to be filed no later than 4:00 p.m. on November 29, 2010, why its "Answer to Compliant for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Civil Penalties; Counter Claim [and] Demand for Jury Trial," should not be stricken. The written response shall state whether a hearing is requested on the OSC. (Kaminski, H)
|