July 10, 2013 |
Filing
76
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/09/13 ordering that the application 75 be, and it hereby is granted, and that a writ of execution issue in the sum of $267.50, plus necessary levying officer fees pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 685.050, be directed to the Sheriff or Marshall of the County of Solano, California. (Plummer, M)
|
December 18, 2012 |
Filing
68
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/17/12 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
November 16, 2012 |
Filing
66
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/15/12 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion for summary judgment. Failure to file an opposition will be deemed as consent to have the: (a) pending motion granted; (b) action dismissed for lack of prosecution; and (c) action dismissed based on plaintiffs failure to comply with these rules and a court order.(Dillon, M)
|
October 9, 2012 |
Filing
63
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/9/2012 ORDERING # 60 that the F & R's are VACATED; Defendants' # 52 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice and within 30 days from the date of this order, defendant s shall file and re-serve the motion for summary judgment, accompanied by the attached notice to plaintiff under Rand; Pursuant to Local Rule 230(l), plaintiff shall file his opposition within 21 days from the date defendants re-file their motion; any reply shall be filed 14 days thereafter. (Reader, L)
|
July 11, 2012 |
Filing
60
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/10/12 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
June 12, 2012 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/12/2012 ORDERING the clerk to send plaintiff a copy of the 57 5/11/2012 order and defendants' 52 12/5/2011 motion for summary judgment; and on or before 7/3/2012, plaintiff shall file an opposition to defendatns' motion for summary judgment. No further extensions of time will be granted. (Yin, K)
|
May 11, 2012 |
Filing
57
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/10/2012 ORDERING the clerk to send plaintiff a copy of defendants' 52 motion for summary judgment; and on or before 6/11/2012, plaintiff shall file an opposition to defendants' motion that complies with the F.R.Civ.P. and the Local Rules. (Yin, K)
|
January 12, 2012 |
Filing
54
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/11/2012 ORDERING that, within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the 52 motion for summary judgment. Failure to file an opposition will be deemed as consent to have the: (a) pending motion granted; (b) action dismissed for lack of prosecution; and (c) action dismissed based on plaintiff's failure to comply with these rules and a court order. (Yin, K)
|
September 13, 2011 |
Filing
49
USCA ORDER #11-17004, appellees' motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction is granted. DISMISSED re 45 Interlocutory Appeal filed by Jerry W. Baker (Reader, L)
|
August 9, 2011 |
Filing
43
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/08/11 ordering plaintiff's 08/03/11 motion for an extension of time 42 is granted. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a copy of discovery requests appended to defendants' reply (Docket Nos. 38-2, 38-3, 38-4 and 38-5). Plaintiff is granted 21 days from the date of this order in which to comply with this court's 07/26/11 order. Plaintiff's 08/02/11 request for appointment of counsel 41 is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/25/11, ORDERING that within 20 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall provide supplemental discovery responses, signed and dated, as set forth at pages 3 - 5 of this Order. At the sam e time plaintiff serves the signed and dated supplemental discovery responses on defendants' counsel, plaintiff shall file a declaration with the court attesting to service of the supplemental responses on counsel. Defendants shall have 30 days thereafter to raise any objection to the responses provided. The August 19, 2011 dispositive motions deadline is STAYED. Plaintiff's 39 motion for sanctions is DENIED. Defendants' 28 motion for expenses is DENIED. Defendants' 38 motion for expenses is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay defendants' expenses in the amount of $570.00. (Kastilahn, A)
|
May 31, 2011 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/31/11 DENYING 27 MOTION to COMPEL production of documents filed by Jerry W. Baker, PARTIALLY GRANTING 28 Motion to Compel; and DENYING 34 MOTION to COMPEL Production of documents filed by Jerry W. Baker. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff, personally, shall serve on counsel for defendants a copy of the discovery responses plaintiff allegedly served on 4/7/11, by hand-delivering it to the appropriate prison official for placing it in the U.S. Mail. After the expiration of the 14 day period, the court will address defendants' motion for expenses. (Meuleman, A)
|
March 14, 2011 |
Filing
25
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/14/11 ORDERING that plaintiffs 21 motion to appoint counsel is DENIED; Plaintiffs 22 request is DENIED without prejudice. The March 17, 2011 deposition of plaintiff shall proceed as noticed. Plaintiffs 23 motion for production of documents is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve this Order on plaintiff by overnight mail.(Dillon, M)
|
September 23, 2010 |
Filing
10
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/23/10 ORDERING that plaintiff's amended complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days to file a second amended complaint. (Dillon, M)
|
August 12, 2010 |
Filing
8
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/11/10 ORDERING the director of the Sheriff of Solano County to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Jerry W. Baker to the clerk until the balan ce of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Solano County. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial)(Dillon, M)
|