June 1, 2016 |
Filing
102
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/1/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (ECF No. 100 ) is DENIED; the Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on plaintiff and on the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cc USCA)(Becknal, R)
|
February 16, 2016 |
Filing
93
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/16/2016 ORDERING that the court will defer consideration of plaintiff's pending 90 motion for sanctions, 91 motion to substitute, and 92 request to use electronic filing until after t he pending 83 findings and recommendations have been resolved. Defendants are not required to file an opposition or otherwise respond to plaintiff's motions or request until directed by the court to do so via subsequent order. The 3/17/2016 hearing regarding plaintiff's motion for sanctions and motion to substitute is VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
|
December 1, 2015 |
Filing
87
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/1/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file objections to the court's 11/4/15 findings and recommendations (ECF No. 85 ) is GRANTED IN PART; Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file objections, if any, to the court's 11/4/15 findings and recommendations. No further extensions of this deadline will be granted. (Becknal, R)
|
November 4, 2015 |
Filing
83
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/4/15 ORDERING that Motion to appoint counsel 80 is denied. Within 30 days of the date of this order, defendants shall file and serve on plaintiff a formal statement of defendant John Jones, Jr.'s death. RECOMMENDING that Motions to dismiss the first amended complaint 72 be granted.This action be dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court be directed to vacate all dates and close this case.F&R referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Kaminski, H)
|
September 15, 2015 |
Filing
76
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/15/2015 ORDERING that the hearing on defendant's 73 motion to dismiss is CONTINUED to 10/29/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Plaintiff shall file a written opposition to defendants' motion, or statement of non-opposition thereto, on or before 10/15/2015. Defendants may file a written reply to plaintiff's opposition, if any, on or before 10/22/2015. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 19, 2015 |
Filing
68
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/19/15 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 67 is GRANTED; By no later than 5/6/15, plaintiff shall file either an amended complaint or a statement that he wishe s to proceed on his original complaint as modified by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals' opinion. Should plaintiff decide to file an amended complaint, the complaint shall contain the following claims only: (1) 42 U.S.C. § 1981 equal p rotection claim against John Jones, Jr.; (2) 42 U.S.C. § 1983 defamation plus claim against John Oakley and John Jones, Jr. to the extent that the claim is asserted against these defendants in their individual capacities; (3) defamation agains t all three defendants; (4) infliction of emotional distress against all three defendants; and (5) violations of California's Unruh Civil Rights Act against all three defendants. Plaintiff is again cautioned that allegations concerning ad ditional claims or against additional defendants asserted in an amended complaint, should plaintiff decide to file one, will be summarily disregarded; Defendants shall file response to plaintiff's complaint by no later than 5/27/15; Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
66
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/12/15. The 8/11/11 46 Judgment is VACATED. Amended complaint or statement from plaintiff that he wishes to proceed on the original complaint due no later than 3/13/15. Response to complaint due no later than 4/10/15. (Manzer, C)
|
February 17, 2012 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/16/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request for additional time to file a transcript designation 56 is denied as moot; and Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal 55 is denied. (Becknal, R)
|
January 5, 2012 |
Filing
50
RELATED CASE 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/4/2012. Action denominated 2:11-CV-3295 MCE CKD is REASSIGNED to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Moulds for all further proceedings. Henceforth, caption on documents filed shall be 2:11-CV-3295 KJM JFM. Clerk shall make appropriate adjustment to compensate for change. (Marciel, M)
|
December 9, 2011 |
Filing
48
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/9/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for a New Trial 47 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
June 8, 2011 |
Filing
43
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 6/7/2011 DENYING plaintiff's 40 41 Motions for Extensions of Time to file Reply Briefs. (Marciel, M)
|
February 10, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds ORDERING pltf's motion to file a late briefing 16 DENIED; pltf's motion for appointment of counsel 18 DENIED; pltf's motion for extension of time 21 GRANTED; IT IS RECOMMENDED pltf's motion for remand to state court 17 be denied; dfts' motion to dismiss 6 be granted; leave to amend be denied; and this action be dismissed; REFERRED to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; objections may be filed within 14 days after being served with these F&R's.(Carlos, K)
|
December 9, 2010 |
Filing
28
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/8/10, ORDERING that 27 pltf's request for permission to take photographs and/or videotape of the motion hearing set for 12/9/10 is DENIED.(Kastilahn, A)
|
October 5, 2010 |
Filing
15
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/4/2010 ORDERING 14 Plaintiff's Opposition to defendants motion to dismiss due by 10/7/2010; dfts reply brief due by 10/21/2010; and Motion 6 to Dismiss Hearing reset for 11/4/2010 at 11:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Reader, L)
|
August 13, 2010 |
Filing
9
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/12/10: Plaintiff's August 4, 2010 motion is partially granted 7 . HEARING as to 6 MOTION to DISMISS continued to 10/7/2010 at 11:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Kaminski, H)
|