Hill v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hill
Defendant: J. Hall, S. McAlpine and Nangalama
Case Number: 2:2010cv01896
Filed: July 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/20/13 ordering the docket reflects that the 03/14/13 settlement conference resulted in a settlement agreement between the parties. The court now orders that dispositional documents be filed not later than 180 days from the date of this order. All outstanding motions are denied as moot. (Plummer, M)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/22/2013 ORDERING the custodian to produce Kenneth Hill #V-86334, to testify in USDC at 9:00 A.M. on 3/14/2013 in courtroom #2, before Magistrat e Judge Craig M. Kellison; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and Warden of CSP-Solano. (cc: OTCD-SAC, CMK) (Yin, K)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/15/12 ORDERING that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve a pretrial statement and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial. Defendants shall file a pretrial statement not later than 30 days after the filing of plaintiffs statement. Pretrial conference (as described in Local Rule 282) will be conducted on the file only, without appearance by either party. The date for jury trial before the assigned district judge will be set in the pretrial order.(Dillon, M)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/9/2012 ORDERING the parties shall submit, within 30 days, confidential statements regarding case selection for prisoner settlement program (as described in this order). (cc: ADR) (Yin, K)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/10/12 denying 30 Motion to Compel. (Plummer, M)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/21/12 GRANTING 27 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiffs requests for written discovery must be served no later than May 23, 2012.(Dillon, M)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/7/12; The findings and recommendations filed November 10, 2011 (ECF No. 18), are ADOPTED in full; The March 3, 2011 (ECF No. 13), motion to dismiss filed by defendants McAlpine, Nangalama, and Hall is DENIED; and Defendants McAlpine, Nangalama, and Hall are ordered to file an answer to the complaint within the time provided in Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Matson, R)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/9/11 ORDERING that the Clerk randomly assign a United States District Judge to this case. It is RECOMMENDED that the 13 Motion to Dismiss filed by defendants McAlpine, Nangalama, and Hall be denied; Defendants McAlpine, Nangalama, and Hall be ordered to file an answer to the complaint within the time provided in Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Motion referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.. (Dillon, M)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kenneth Hall signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/8/2010. (Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. McAlpine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nangalama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?