United States of America v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2010cv01964
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/12/2011 ORDERING that pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs, including attorney's fees. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/6/11: The deadline to file disposition papers with the Court currently set for July 1, 2011 is extended to July 11, 2011. (Kaminski, H)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SECOND STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/10/2011 ORDERING 18 that U.S. Bank to file an opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is EXTENDED by two days, from 6/8/2011 to 6/10/2011; pltf shall still file a reply to U.S. Bank's opposition on or before 6/15/2011; WHEREFORE, the Parties request that this Court enter an Order consistent with this Stipulation. (Reader, L)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER 16 signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/24/11; The hearing for 12 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is reset to 6/22/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The Partie s are required to disclose their expert witnesses and produce their expert witness reports on July 14, 2011. The Parties shall disclose any rebuttal experts and to produce any rebuttal reports on or before August 15, 2011. Plaintiff propounded Interr ogatories (Set Two) and Request for Production of Documents (Set Two) to U.S. Bank. The deadline for U.S. Bank to respond to these discovery requests is extended to July 15, 2011 for U.S. Bank to respond to Plaintiffs Interrogatories (Set Two) and Request for Production of Documents (Set Two).(Matson, R)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND DATES FOR DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/8/11. The Court EXTENDS the Expert Disclosure deadlines currently set for 4/29/11 to 5/30/11 and the Rebuttal Expert Disclosure deadline currently set for 5/30/11 to 6/30/11. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Adam Ryan Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?