Evans v. CSP Sacramento, et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Evans
Defendant: CSP Sacramento, A Briones, N P Bakwell and Vance
Case Number: 2:2010cv01969
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/15/2011 DENYING plaintiff's 41 motion to amend. (Yin, K)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/4/2011 RECOMMENDING that dft's 31 motion to dismiss be granted and this case be dismissed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/23/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery 32 is DENIED. Plaintiff shall file an opposition to the Motion to Dismiss. Failure to file an opposition will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/24/2011 DENYING pltf's 24 motion for a court-ordered deadline. (Yin, K)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kenneth Evans signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/1/2010. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee of $2.37 and thereafter the $347.63 balance and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/07/10 ordering plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the clerk of the court. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Plummer, M)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/13/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 2 application to proceed IFP is DISMISSED w/out prejudice; the clerk to send pltf a new ifp application; and pltf to submit w/in 28 days a completed ifp application. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. CSP Sacramento, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSP Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Briones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N P Bakwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?