Burton v. McDonald, et al
Plaintiff: Harrison L. Burton
Defendant: McDonald, R. L. Gower, S. Armoskus, Chapman, Romero, Wilcox, Moore, Fleetwood, Groves, Webster, - Haworth and Moya
Case Number: 2:2010cv01980
Filed: July 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/31/14 recommending that the fifth amended complaint 81 be dismissed without leave to amend for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and the clerk of the court be directed to close the case. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/17/14 ORDERING that plaintiff's 74 fourth amended complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days to file an amended complaint.(Dillon, M)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/10/12 denying 64 Motion to Compel. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff the court's form complaint for a prisoner civil rights action and accompanying instructions. Plaintiff is granted 60 days from the date of this order in which to file and serve a proposed fourth amended complaint. Plaintiff's 10/11/12 motion for appointment of counsel 70 is denied. (Plummer, M)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/23/2012, within 10 days defendants shall file and serve a response to plaintiff's 64 motion to compel; and the deadline for filing a fourth amended complaint is VACATED and will be reset, as appropriate, by further order of court.(Yin, K)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 7/12/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's third amended complaint is DISMISSED; within 30 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the Notice of Amendment with the required documents; defendants' 57 motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot; and defendants shall not respond to any fourth amended complaint unless and until ordered to do so. (Yin, K)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 01/03/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's 53 Motion for Entry of Default is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/15/2011 ORDERING that the 49 findings and recommendations filed November 8, 2011 are adopted in full. Plaintiff's 42 October 20, 2011 motion is DENIED. (Duong, D)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/7/2011 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 42 motion to stay be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/4/11 ORDERING 30 Findings and Recommendations are adopted in full; and 26 Motion for Injunctive relief is denied.(Matson, R)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 7/1/11: Plaintiff's May 31, 2011 motion for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's June 3, 2011 motion to amend is granted. Plaintiff's second amended complain t is dismissed. This court's May 26, 2011 order directing the United States Marshal to serve process in this action is vacated. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Plaintiff's June 15, 2011 motion for production of documents is construed as a request for production of documents and, so construed, is disregarded. (Kaminski, H)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/13/11 ORDERING that plaintiff's amended complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days to file a second amended complaint. Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a form civil rights complaint and accompanying instructions.(Dillon, M)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/19/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 5 request to proceed IFP is GRANTED; pltf to pay the $350.00 filing fee w/ an initial partial filing fee in accordance w/ the concurrent CDC order; pltf's cmplt is DISMISSED; w/in 30 days, pltf to complete and return the Notice of Amendment w/ the required documents.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. McDonald, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison L. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Armoskus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleetwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Haworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?