Dekalb v. Marsh

Petitioner: James Dekalb
Respondent: Marsh
Case Number: 2:2010cv02063
Filed: July 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/20/2010 DIRECTING the clerk to assign a district judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed as moot for the reasons expressed in the August 30, 2010 order. Assigned and Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/30/2010 ORDERING that w/in 21 days, pltf to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed as moot. (Yin, K)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/3/10 (for case no. 2:10-cv-1427 GGH) ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to open a separate 28 U.S.C. § 2254 action for plaintiff; Assign the undersigned magistrate judge and make an appropriate adjustment in the assignment of § 2254 cases to compensate for such assignment;File and docket a copy of this order in the new separate habeas action; Place copy of the 9 petition, and a copy of this order in the additional separate file opened for this plaintiff; Send plaintiff an endorsed copy of his petition and a copy of this order both in this case and in the newly opened case.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dekalb v. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Dekalb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?