Battle v. Posadas et al

Plaintiff: Noah Henry Omechante Battle
Defendant: A Posadas, Harrison and Cameron
Case Number: 2:2010cv02135
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/20/11 Recommending that this action be dismissed with prejudice. These Findings and Recommendations are referred to U.S. District Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. Within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections with the Court. 2011 (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/16/10 ORDERING that 9 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are VACATED; Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days to file an amended complaint.(Dillon, M)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/9/10 recommending that this action be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Noah H.O. Battle signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/3/2010. The Sheriff of Solano County is to collect an initial partial filing fee, if assessed in accompanying ifp order , and then after monthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the the Sheriff of Solano County. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle v. Posadas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Henry Omechante Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Posadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?