United States of America v. Approximately $7, 960.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $7, 960.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $2,260.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $3,195.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $3,927.00 in U.S. Currency and 2007 Cadillac Escalade EXT, VIN: 3GYFK62837G222266
Case Number: 2:2010cv02167
Filed: August 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/17/2012 ENTERING JUDGMENT against Claimants Lilah Thomasson, Jamarus Smith, and Monique Banks; FORFEITING all right, title, and interest of the property listed herein to the U nited States of America; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal Service to sell the defendant vehicle and distribute net proceeds, less storage fees, maintenance fees, disposal costs and auctioneer fees as follows: $10,000 to Claimant Lilah Thomasson, the remainder to the United States of America; ORDERING all parties to bear their own costs. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this Final Judgment of Forfeiture. (Michel, G)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/7/2012 ORDERING that the United States' 34 Motion to Strike is GRANTED. The Claims of Jamarus Smith and Monique Banks are STRICKEN for failing to comply with Rule G(5) and/or pursuant to Rule G(8)(c)(i)(A)-(B) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions because said claimants lacks standing. (Zignago, K.)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/19/2010 ORDERING 21 this matter is STAYED pursuant to 18:981(g)(1) and 981(g)(2) until the conclusion of the related criminal case. Within 30 days after the criminal case has concluded claimants will file their Answer to the Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, and the parties will submit a joint status report addressing the matters set forth in the 8/13/2010, Order Requiring Joint Status Report. (Reader, L)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED ORDER as to Jamarus Smith signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/27/2010 ORDERING this matter and 2:10-cv-2167 MCE KJM are related. Because the cases are already assigned to the same district judge, this Order is issued for informational purposes only and shall have no effect on the status of the case. (Matson, R)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/20/10. (Kaminski, H)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/16/10 ORDERING that the clerk of the USDC, Eastern District of California, shall issue a Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem for the defendant currency and the defendant vehicle. (Williams, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $7, 960.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kristin S. Door
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $7, 960.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $2,260.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $3,195.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $3,927.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2007 Cadillac Escalade EXT, VIN: 3GYFK62837G222266
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?