Johnson v. Varakin et al
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Defendant: Walter A. Varakin and Genevieve A. Varakin
Case Number: 2:2010cv02175
Filed: August 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/1/2011 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1); each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/25/2011 ORDERING 17 that the dispositional documents disposing of the case be filed no later than 20 days from the effective date of this order. All hearing dates heretofore set in this matter are hereby VACATED. (Reader, L)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/1/10, ORDERING this matter REFERRED to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. The status conference currently set for 12/6/10 is hereby VACATED. (Kastilahn, A)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/20/2010 GRANTING 7 Plaintiffs Request to Continue; Status Conference reset for 12/6/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Status reports shall be filed 14 days prior to the status conference. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Varakin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter A. Varakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genevieve A. Varakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Represented By: Scott N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?