Garcia v. Sacramento Coca-Cola Bottling Co., Inc.
Petitioner: Olivia Garcia
Respondent: Sacramento Coca-Cola Bottling Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02176
Filed: August 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:160
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/15/2011 ORDERING that the case had been settled. CASE CLOSED. (Duong, D)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/20/2010 ORDERING that the Board's Petition for Injunction is GRANTED. (Krueger, M)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/13/2010; Judge William B. Shubb recuses himself as the judge to whom this case is assigned because of a financial interest in Coca-Cola. It is ordered that the Clerk reassign this case to another judge for all further proceedings. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Sacramento Coca-Cola Bottling Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Olivia Garcia
Represented By: Micah Berul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sacramento Coca-Cola Bottling Co., Inc.
Represented By: Dennis R Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?