Cerny v. Dickinson et al
Petitioner: Bruce Armand Cerny
Respondent: K L Dickinson and Matthew Cate
Case Number: 2:2010cv02190
Filed: August 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/11/2011 recommending that petitioner's 1 application for writ of habeas be denied; referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within twenty-one days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Duong, D) Modified on 8/12/2011 (Duong, D).
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/3/2010 ORDERING that the 14 findings and recommendations are VACATED; ptnr's 15 motion to stay is GRANTED; this action is STAYED pending a final decision by the Ninth Circuit in case n o. 10-56094; ptnr to notify this court of the Ninth Circuit's decision w/in 30 days after issuance of remittitur demonstrating the finality of the appellate court's decision, and indicate therein whether a further stay is requested; and the clerk to administratively close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/14/10 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed w/out prejudice due to ptnr's failure to keep the court apprised of his current address. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cerny v. Dickinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bruce Armand Cerny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K L Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?