Foos v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Plaintiff: Stephen Foos
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 2:2010cv02201
Filed: August 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/19/2011 recommending that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Duong, D)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER adopting 26 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 1/14/11: Defendant's motion to dismiss is granted 14 . Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint. Any amended complaint must be filed within 30 days of the date of this order. (Kaminski, H)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/4/11: The scheduling conference set for January 13, 2011, is vacated, to be reset following final resolution of the pending motion to dismiss, if appropriate. (Kaminski, H)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/15/2010 RECOMMENDS that defendants Motion 14 to Dismiss be granted with leave to amend; any amended complaint should be filed within 30 days of the date these findings and recommendations are adopted. Referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.; Objections due 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/14/2010. Defendant's 14 Motions to Dismiss Complaint, for More Definite Statement, and to Strike Punitive Damages Hearing is CONTINUED to 11/18/2010 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK). (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foos v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?