DuRoss v. California State Prison-Warden et al
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony DuRoss
Defendant: California State Prison-Warden, Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Arnold Schwarzenegger and John Chiang
Case Number: 2:2010cv02225
Filed: August 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/3/2011 DENYING pltf's 29 motion. Any documents filed by ptf from this date forward will be disregarded; no orders will issue in response to future filings. (Yin, K)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/1/11 GRANTING 26 Motion to Proceed IFP on appeal. (Dillon, M)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/28/2011 ORDERING that pltf's 22 motion to vacate is DENIED w/out prejudice; pltf's 24 motion to proceed IFP is denied w/out prejudice; the clerk to send pltf a new ifp application; and pltf to submit w/in 30 days, a completed affidavit to proceed ifp and a certified trust acct statement. (Yin, K)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/10/10 ORDERING that plaintiffs 8 motion is denied without prejudice; 10 motion for default judgment is denied; Clerk of Court is directed to randomly draw a district judge. It is RECOMMENDED that that this action be referred to the Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento. Randomly assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/24/2010. Plaintiff's 1 Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend w/in 30 days from date of this Order. Clerk directed to send plaintiff forms for filing Prisoner Civil Right and an Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Defendants' 1 Request for Extension of Time is DENIED and they are RELIEVED from their obligation to file a responsive pleading until Court so directs. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DuRoss v. California State Prison-Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony DuRoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Prison-Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Represented By: David Eugene Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chiang
Represented By: David Eugene Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?