December 2, 2011 |
Filing
34
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/01/11 recommending that that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). MOTION to DISMISS 22 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
|
November 14, 2011 |
Filing
32
AMENDED ORDER TAXING COSTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/14/11 ORDERING that within 14 days from the date of this order, defendant Jacobsen shall pay to the United States Marshal the sum of $153.86, unless within that time d efendant files a written statement showing good cause for his failure to timely waive service. The court does not intend to extend this fourteen-day period. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (cc USM)(Dillon, M)
|
November 3, 2011 |
Filing
30
ORDER and ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/2/11ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Lee James Bailey to the clerk until the balance of 6;350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. Clerk of Court is direct ed to serve on plaintiff, at his current address, a copy of this courts order 27 ; plaintiff is informed that failure to timely respond to that order, and to file an opposition to defendants pending motion to dismiss, shall result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. Clerk of Court is directed to update plaintiffs address to Lee James Bailey (CDCR # AK0711), Deuel Vocational Institution, P.O. Box 600, Tracy, CA 95378-0600. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
|
October 20, 2011 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/19/2011 ORDERING that, w/in 30 days, pltf shall file an opposition, if any, to the pending 22 motion to dismiss. (Yin, K)
|
August 26, 2011 |
Filing
20
ORDER denying 14 Motion for More Definite Statement signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/24/11; Defendants shall timely file a pleading that is responsive to plaintiff's original complaint. (Matson, R)
|
August 25, 2011 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/24/11 ORDERING within 14 days from the date of this order, defendant Jacobsen shall pay to the United States Marshal the sum of $81.52, unless within that time defendant files a written statement showing good cause for his failure to timely waive service. The court does not intend to extend this fourteen-day period. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal.(Matson, R)
|
June 23, 2011 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/21/11 ORDERING that, within thirty days after the filing date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an opposition, to the pending Motion for more definite statement. Failure to file an opposition will be deemed as consent to have the pending (a) Motion granted; (b) Action dismissed for lack of prosecution; and/or (c) Action dismissed based on Plaintiff's failure to comply with these rules and a court order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
January 19, 2011 |
Filing
8
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Lee James Bailey signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/18/2011; Sheriff of Solano County is directed to collect the initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accoradance with this order; Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on Sheriff of Solano County and the court's financial unit.(Waggoner, D)
|