Solano v. America's Servicing Company, et al
Plaintiff: Constance Solano
Defendant: America's Servicing Company, Wells Fargo, NA, Mortgageit, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., NDEX West, LLC, Financial Title Company, U.S. Bank, NA, Banc of America Funding 2007-6 Trust and Mortgage and Investors Investment Consultants, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02426
Filed: September 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/21/12; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Lis Pendens recorded on September 13, 2010 in the Placer County Recorder's Office as document number 2010-0071698-00 is hereby expunged.(Matson, R)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER of dismissal signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/25/11 ORDERING that since the balance of the factors favors dismissal of this action with prejudice, this action is dismissed with prejudice and judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendants. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/6/2011 re 53 ORDERING that the 33 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order is modified as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses ddl 1/24/2012; Discovery ddl 6/13/2012; Dispositive Motions Hearing 8/13/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Duong, D)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/26/2011 GRANTING 38 and 40 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff to file Second Amended Complaint within 14 days. (Michel, G)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/10/2011 ORDERING having considered 35 Stipulation and Proposed Order filed by Mortgageit, Inc., the 33 Scheduling Order is hereby MODIFIED such that: (1) the initial expert witness disclosure deadline shall be extended from May 20,2011, to October 20, 2011; and (2) the rebuttal expert witness disclosure deadline shall be extended from June 20, 2011, to November 21, 2011. (Waggoner, D)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 5/3/2011 ORDERING Movant's 9 , 15 dismissal motion is GRANTED. Therefore, MortgageIT's 12 motion to strike is DENIED as MOOT; pltf is GRANTED 14 days from the date on which this order is filed to file a First Amended Complaint addressing the deficiencies in any claim dismissed without prejudice. This action may be dismissed with prejudice against the Movants under FRCP 41(b) if pltf fails to file an amended complaint within the prescribed time period. (Reader, L)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/9/11 ORDERING that the Status Conference is CONTINUED to 3/28/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A further joint status report shall be filed no later than fou rteen (14) days prior to Status Conference. Further, Plaintiff is notified under Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that any defendant not served within the 120 day period prescribed in that Rule may be dismissed as defendants in this action unless Plaintiff provides proof of service or "shows good cause for the failure to serve within this prescribed period in a filing due no later than 4:00 p.m. on February 14, 2011. (Duong, D)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/10/2010 DENYING 2 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solano v. America's Servicing Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Solano
Represented By: Holly S. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgageit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Funding 2007-6 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage and Investors Investment Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?