Robinson v. Cunan
Plaintiff: Joseph Robinson
Defendant: Jeff Cunan
Case Number: 2:2010cv02464
Filed: September 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 7/12/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for Reconsideration 67 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 2/9/2012 ORDERING that defendant's # 60 request for attorneys' fees is PARTIALLY GRANTED; Plaintiff shall pay to defendant $7,728.00 within 30 days from the date of this order. (Reader, L)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/6/11 ORDERING the findings and recommendations 49 ADOPTED IN FULL; dft's motion to dismiss 24 GRANTED; and the Clerk is directed to close this case.(Carlos, K)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 2/23/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to RESCUE 40 is DENIED. Plaintiff's MOTION for WARRANT 41 is DENIED. All hearings in this matter are VACATED. a nd IT IS RECOMMENDED that Defendant's MOTION to DISMISS 24 be granted. This Action be dismissed with prejudice. These FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are submitted to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Within twenty one days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 02/14/11 GRANTING 21 Motion to Quash ; Pending resolution of defendants motion to dismiss, plaintiff shall refrain from issuing any further subpoenas in this action to defendant or any non-party. (Williams, D)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/3/11 ORDERING plaintiff's 29 ex parte Motion for an order to show cause is DENIED; the hrg set for 1/13/11 is VACATED; Plaintiff's ex parte motion 32 for recusal or remedy is DENIED; plaintiff's motion 33 to quash and rescind order is DENIED; Plaintiff's motion 34 to recuse is DENIED and the hrg set for 1/20/11 is VACATED; and Plaintiff's Motion 35 to enforce subpoenas is DENIED and the hrg set for 1/20/11 is VACATED. (Becknal, R)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/22/2010 DENYING 26 Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas. It is HEREBY ORDERED that insofar as plaintiff subpoenas any person for a January 13, 2011 hearing, any party or non-party in receipt of said subpoena need not reply, either by complying or moving to quash the subpoena, as there is no hearing in this matter scheduled for that date. (Donati, J)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/13/10 ORDERING that the motion 13 hearing scheduled for 12/16/10 is vacated and Plaintiff's motion for warrant is denied. (Becknal, R)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/15/2010. Plaintiff's 2 4 7 Motions to Proceed In Forma Pauperis are DENIED as MOOT. Within 60 days from date of this Order, plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why this action should not be dismissed. (Marciel, M)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 09/23/10 ORDERING plf to submit, w/i 20 days, either a completed application and affidavit in support of his 2 request for IFP on the form provided by the Clerk or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk to send plf a new IFP Application. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Cunan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Cunan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?