Mlejnecky v. Olympus Imaging America Inc.
Plaintiff: Stefanie Mlejnecky
Defendant: Olympus Imaging America Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02630
Filed: September 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 06/26/12 108 Notice of Request to Seal Documents ORDERING the Clerk to: (1) Place [63-12] Exhibit 24, [63-13]Exhibit 25, [63-13] Exhibit 27 and [63-14] Exhibit 33 to the Declaration of Beth E. Terrell submitt ed in support of plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification under SEAL; and REPLACE the [63-1] redacted version of the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification that is currently available on the Court's docket (Doc. No. 63-1) with the correct version attached to the 108 Request as Exhibit A. (Benson, A.)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 05/22/12 ORDERING that defendant's 105 Request to Correct is GRANTED; Clerk shall replace the redacted version of the 69 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Olympus Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification that is currently available on the Courts docket with the correct version. (Benson, A.)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/18/2012 GRANTING 103 Motion for Redaction of Electronic Transcript of 4/18/2012 Hearing. Court Reporter shall redact items identified in Exhibit A to Motion for Redaction. (Marciel, M)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/16/2012 GRANTING 89 Request to Seal Amended Declaration of Albert Diaz. (Michel, G)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/11/12 ORDERING Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Stefanie Mlejnecky's Individual Claims Without Prejudice and Without Award of Costs and Attorney Fees Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and Withdrawal of Plaintiff Stefanie Mlejnecky as Named Plaintiff. (Meuleman, A)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/22/12; Having considered Defendant Olympus Imaging America Inc.'s ("Olympus") Request toSeal Documents, and good cause appearing therefore, the Court hereby GRANTS Olympus'sRequest to Seal Documents. The following documents shall be filed under seal: (1) Exhibit H to the Declaration of Ryan T. Hansen; (2) Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jennifer Schmell; (3) Exhibits B, C, D, and E to the Declaration of Albert Diaz; and (4) unredacted versions of the Memorandum of Points and Authorities and the Declarations of Dr. Duane Steffey, Dr. John McNulty, Jennifer Schmell, Albert Diaz, and Ryan T. Hansen submitted in support of Olympus's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification.(Matson, R)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/18/2012 GRANTING 62 Notice of Request to Seal Documents. The Court, having considered Plaintiffs' Request to Seal Documents, the documents themselves, Olympus' Response, if any, and Plaintiffs 9; Reply, if any, hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' Request to Seal Documents. The following nine documents shall be filed under seal: Exhibits 4, 19, 26, 30, 31, 32, 36 to the Declaration of Beth E. Terrell in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Cla ss Certification; Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Beth E. Terrell in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend their Second Amended Complaint, which consists of excerpts from a deposition transcript obtained within the last thirty days; and an unredacted version of Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Zignago, K.)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/3/2011 GRANTING extension of class certification filing deadline. Pltfs to file their motion for class certification: 1/17/2012; Dfts file their response: 3/19/2012; Pltfs file their reply: 4/9/2012. (Zignago, K.)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER 56 granting extension of class certification filing deadline signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/2/11, ORDERING that plaintiffs shall file their motion for class certification ON 11/7/11, defendant's response is due ON 1/17/12, and plaintiffs' reply is due ON 2/7/12. (Kastilahn, A)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/23/2011 GRANTING 39 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Olympus shall file its answer to the Second Amended Complaint within 20 days. (Zignago, K.)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/8/11. (Kaminski, H)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Dendant's Motion to Dismiss, signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/18/11. Plaintiff shall file her second amended complaint within 20 days of the date of this Order.(Kastilahn, A)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/7/11 ORDERING that Defendant's 20 motion for a protective order is DENIED. The parties shall exchange their mandatory initial disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a )(1) on or before March 7, 2011. Defendant shall respond to plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production, as narrowed by plaintiff during the parties' efforts to meet and confer, on or before March 21, 2011. Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs is DENIED. (Duong, D)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/22/10 ORDERING that the deadline for the Parties to submit a Joint Status Report is extended from November 29, 2010 to December 13, 2010.(Williams, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mlejnecky v. Olympus Imaging America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympus Imaging America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefanie Mlejnecky
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?