Fountain v. Lebron et al
Plaintiff: Carl Fountain
Defendant: A Lebron, Gonzales, Michael Cooper and Martel
Case Number: 2:2010cv02633
Filed: September 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/24/13 ordering the Custodian to produce Carl Fountain at 1/31/13 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 27 before Judge Dale A. Drozd. Custodian is orde red to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(3 certified copies of this writ sent to the Warden of MCSP)(Courtesy copy sent to MCSP by fax at 209-274-4861) (Plummer, M) Modified on 1/25/2013 (Plummer, M).
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/17/12 ordering the custodian to produce Carl Fountain at 1/31/13 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 27 before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(3 certified copies of writ sent to the Warden at MCSP)(Plummer, M) Modified on 12/18/2012 (Plummer, M).
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/18/2012 ORDERING that within 21 days, each party shall inform the court in writing as to whether they wish to proceed with the settlement conference before Judge Dale A. Drozd or if they wish to be referred to the court's mediation program; and the clerk is to send each party the waiver of disqualification form for settlement conferences. (Yin, K)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/5/12 ADOPTING IN FULL 67 Findings and Recommendations; DENYING 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Meuleman, A)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/17/2012 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 46 motion for summary judgment be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/20/12 ADOPTING 44 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; and GRANTING 25 MOTION to Dismiss in part or strike plaintiff's complaint as follows: Plaintiff's monetary damages claims against all defendants, including defendant Lebron, in their official capacities are DISMISSED; and Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief, prohibiting retaliation against him, is DISMISSED. (Meuleman, A)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/21/11 recommending that the motion to dismiss in part or strike brought on behalf of defendants Cooper and Gonzales 25 be granted as follows: a. Plaintiff's monetary damages claims against all defendants, including defendant Lebron, in their official capacities be dismissed; Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief prohibiting retaliation against him be dismissed. Motion to Dismiss 25 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/27/11 ORDERING 36 Ex Parte Application for leave to dispose plaintiff is denied as unnecessary; and GRANTING 40 Substitution of Attorney; David Springfield is substituted as plaintiff's attorney of record. (Matson, R)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/01/11 denying 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff's document styled, "Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's answer and demand for jury trial 29 filed on 07/26/11 is stricken. (Plummer, M)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/5/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 9/2810 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 is DENIED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner for use in a civil rights action; and Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided with this order; Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to comply with this order or seek an extension of time to do so will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fountain v. Lebron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Lebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?