Gillaspy v. County of Sacramento
Plaintiff: Alexander Gillaspy
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2010cv02753
Filed: October 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE: SETTMENT AND DISPOSITION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/19/12 ORDERING dispositional documents to be filed not later than 75 days from the date of this order and VACATING all hearing dates set. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY BE GROUNDS FOR THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS ON ANY AND ALL COUNSEL OR PARTIES WHO CONTRIBUTED TO THE VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER. (Meuleman, A)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER 28 to modify 11 Scheduling Order signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/9/2012. The deadline for completing Discovery is continued to 3/30/2012. Disclosure of Expert Witnesses is now due by 1/30/2012. A Mid-Litigation Statement shall be submitted no later than 3/16/2012. The new deadline for Law and Motion to be completed for Judge Karlton by 5/30/2012. (Marciel, M) Modified on 1/9/2012 (Marciel, M).
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/14/11: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 12/31/2011. Discovery due by 2/29/2012. The deadline for filing the mid-litigation statement shall be continued to February 15, 2012. The deadline for completing law and motion shall be continued to April 30, 2012.(Kaminski, H)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/14/2011 ORDERING Settlement Conference SET for 12/29/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan; parties are directed to submit confidential settlement conference st atements to chambers 7 days prior to the settlement conference; each party is directed to file a signed waiver of disqualification 7 days prior to the settlement conference; each party is directed to have a principal capable of disposition at the settlement conference or to be fully authorized to settle the matter on any terms. (Waggoner, D)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/21/11: Discovery due by 1/18/2012. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/18/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Jury Trial set for 9/18/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillaspy v. County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Gillaspy
Represented By: Johnny L. Griffin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?