Cervantes v. McDonald
Petitioner: Christopher Cervantes
Respondent: mcdonald
Case Number: 2:2010cv02906
Filed: October 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/14/11 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/4/11 ORDERING that 6 Motion to Stay is DENIED without prejudice; Petitioners December 6, 2010 first amended petition is dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to exhaust state remedies. Petitioner is granted thirty days from the date of service of this order to file a second amended petition. Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner the courts form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus(Dillon, M)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/9/2010 ORDERING that w/in 21 days, ptnr to submit an application to proceed ifp or the $5.00 filing fee; the clerk to send ptnr an ifp application.(Yin, K)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/03/10 ordering petitioner's 10/28/10 request is denied without prejudice. Petitioner is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a petition. Petitioner shall also s ubmit within 30 days from the date of this order, the application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the clerk of court, or the filing fee in the amount of $5.00. The clerk of the court shall send petitioner the court's form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus and the application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cervantes v. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: mcdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?