Bridgewater v. Cate, et al
Plaintiff: Keith Ruben Bridgewater
Defendant: Matthew Cate, James Walker and Richard Taylor
Case Number: 2:2010cv02971
Filed: November 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/23/2015 RECOMMENDING that the 96 motion for summary judgment filed on behalf of defendants Turner and Virga based on plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative re medies prior to filing suit as required be granted; the court decline to excercise supplemental jurisdiction over any state law claims and dismiss any state law claims without prejudice to plaintiff re-filing them in state court; and this action be closed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/08/15 ordering plaintiff's motion to compel defendant Virga to produce further documents in response to his discovery requests 79 is denied. Plaintiff's motion to compel defendant Turner to produce further documents in response to his discovery requests 84 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to conduct discovery 80 is denied. (Plummer, M)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/07/15 granting 91 Motion to modify the scheduling order. Defendants shall file any dispositive motion on or before 2/27/15. Except as otherwise stated in this order, the court's discovery and scheduling order issued on 6/19/14 remains in effect. (Plummer, M)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/23/14 ordering plaintiff's motion to dismiss defendant Hickman 74 is granted. Defendant Hickman is dismissed from this action. Plaintiff's motion to proceed solely against defendants Virga and Turner 75 is granted. (Plummer, M)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/27/2014 GRANTING defendant Hickman's 67 request for the court to conduct a sua sponte screening of the amended complaint; within 14 days, plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing w hy the court should not dismiss defendant Hickman; and defendant Hickman's 68 motion for an extension of time to file an answer to the amended complaint is DENIED as unnecessary; defendant Hickman is relieved of having to file an answer in this action until further order by the court. (Yin, K)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/12/14 ordering that Shanan L. Hewitt, of the Law Offices of Rivera & Associates, is substituted in on Case Number 2:10-cv-2971 TLN DAD, and Russa Boyd, Deputy Attorney General, is substituted out of said case as attorney of record for defendant R. Hickman. (Plummer, M)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/11/2013 ORDERING that the 50 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART. Defendants' 25 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Within thirty days of the date of this order, defendants Officer Turner, Warden Virga, and former-Secretary Hickman shall file an answer to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment inadequate medical care claims and state law claims for negligence. (Zignago, K.)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/10/13 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 5/31/13 47 are ADOPTED in full; Plaintiff's MOTION for further judicial intervention in connection with his attempts to locate defendant Hazlewood 41 is DENIED; and Defendant Hazlewood is DISMISSED without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and 41(b).(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/8/13 RECOMMENDING that Defendants motion to dismiss 25 be granted; Defendants Warden Virga and former-Secretary Hickman be dismissed from this action; and within 30 days o f any order adopting these findings and recommendations, defendant Officer Turner be directed to file an answer to plaintiffs sole remaining claim that defendant Turner was deliberately indifferent to plaintiffs serious medical needs when he assigned plaintiff to an upper bunk knowing that plaintiff had a lower bunk chrono. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/31/13 ORDERING within 30 days of the date of service of this order plaintiff shall file an opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. Defendants shall file a reply, if any, in accordance with Local Rule 230(l). Defendant Hickman's request to join defendant Turner and Virga's motion to dismiss 42 is granted. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for further judicial intervention i n connection with his attempts to locate defendant Hazlewood 41 be denied; and defendant Hazlewood be dismissed without prejudice. MOTION for Judicial Intervention to Resolve Dispute of Missing Defendants Not Being Served Summons and Complaint 41 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/28/13 ordering within 30 days of the date of this order, defendant Hickman shall file a response to plaintiff's amended complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff 1 US M-285 form, 1 summons, instruction sheet and a copy of the amended complaint 15 to be completed and returned within 30 days with the attached Notice of Submission of Documents. Plaintiff's motion to amend 38 is granted. The first amended complaint is deemed amended to name R. Hickman instead of Hicks as the defendant in this action. (Plummer, M)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/30/13 ordering plaintiff's 1/15/13 motion to have the U.S. Marshal complete service of process on defendants Hicks and Hazlewood 32 is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days from the date of this order counsel for defendants shall inform the court in writing whether counsel is willing to accept service on behalf of defendant Hazlewood and/or defendant Hicks, and whether counsel will represent either or both of those defendants. Plaintiff's 1/22/13 motion for an extension of time 33 is granted. The court will set a new briefing schedule on defendants' 12/04/12 motion to dismiss following receipt of defense counsel's response to this order. (Plummer, M)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/22/2011 ORDERING that plaintiff's 13 request for a copy of his amended complaint is DENIED; and plaintiff has 30 days to file an amended complaint. (Yin, K)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/05/11 denying 10 Motion for a court order. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Keith Bridgewater signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/18/11. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgewater v. Cate, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Ruben Bridgewater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?