Davis v. Schroeder et al
Plaintiff: |
James L. Davis |
Defendant: |
Schroeder, Mathew Cate and - Leiber |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv02972 |
Filed: |
November 4, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 7, 2012 |
Filing
28
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/6/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion to intervene 25 is denied; Plaintiffs motion for leave to file an amended complaint 26 is denied as moot; it is RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
|
December 5, 2012 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/4/2012. The Magistrate Judge's Orders 19 granting extension of time and 24 denying Motion to Amend are AFFIRMED. (Marciel, M)
|
July 30, 2012 |
Filing
24
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/30/2012, ORDERING that plaintiff's 22 motion to amend is DENIED as moot; and plaintiff is granted leave to file a fourth amended complaint, not longer than 20 pages, within 30 days. (Yin, K)
|
May 22, 2012 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/22/12 DENYING 18 Motion for disqualification. (Dillon, M)
|
April 13, 2012 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/12/12 ordering that the second amended complaint ( 14 , exhibit 1) is dismissed for the reasons discussed above, with leave to file a third amended complaint not longer than 20 pages within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
|
October 11, 2011 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/11/11 ordering that the amended complaint 8 , exhibit 1 is dismissed for the reasons discussed above, with leave to file a second amended complaint within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing
11
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/19/11 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of James L. Davis to the clerk until the balance of $350 is p aid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders ). (Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?