J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Day
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: David Michael Day
Case Number: 2:2010cv03023
Filed: November 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/10/14 ORDERING that plaintiff's April 29, 2014 request is denied without prejudice. (Becknal, R)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in the amount of $10,000 in statutory damages and $20,000 inenhanced statutory damages for a total award of $30,000 against David Michael Day. (Reader, L)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/15/2011: ORDERING that the Clerk shall serve the Findings and Recommendations on the defaulting defendant at the address indicated on plaintiff's proof of service; RECOMMENDATION that 17 MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Defendant David Michael Day, individually and d/b/a Nick's Nightclub and Bar a/k/a Off Limits filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. be granted in part; judgment shoul d be rendered in the amount of $10,000 in statutory damages and $20,000 in enhanced statutory damages for a total award of $30,000. Matter referred to Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections to F&R may be filed w/i 14 days from the date of service. (Waggoner, D)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/19/2011 ORDERING the 5/26/2011 hearing on the 17 Motion for Default Judgment is VACATED. The motion is SUBMITTED on the record. (Donati, J)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 03/21/11 ORDERING Initial Scheduling Conference re-set for 5/9/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Williams, D)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/2/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED an additional sixty (60) days from today's date to effectuate service of the Summons and Complaint filed in this matter, or to file a Motion for service by publication, or in the alternative, a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant David Michael Day, where service has not been made or service by publication requested.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re 5 Ex Parte Application filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc., signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/10/11, ORDERING that the Scheduling Conference is CONT'D from 1/24/2011 TO 3/28/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Michael Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?