J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Salcedo et al
Plaintiff: |
J & J Sports Productions, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Edith Silvina Salcedo and Maria Teresa Salcedo |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv03037 |
Filed: |
November 10, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Yolo |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank C. Damrell |
Nature of Suit: |
Cable/Satellite TV |
Cause of Action: |
47 U.S.C. § 553 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 21, 2013 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 3/20/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's voluntary dismissal motion 33 is granted. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
|
February 27, 2013 |
Filing
31
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/27/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff and Defendant Maria Teresa Salcedo are ORDERED to Show Cause in a writing to be filed no later than 3/15/2013, why sanctions shluld not be imposed agains them and/or their counsel for the failure to timely file a Final Pretrial Statements. The Final Pretrial Conference is RESCHEDULED for 3/25/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/08/11 ORDERING that an Initial Scheduling Conference is SET for 01/13/12 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Plaintiff shall file and serve his own separate status report on or before December 30, 2011, and the pro se defendant shall file and serve her own separate status report on or before January 6, 2012. (Benson, A.)
|
September 1, 2011 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/1/2011 ORDERING that since Dft Maria Teresa Salcedo is proceeding in pro per, this case is REFERRED to the assigned Magistrate Judge under Local Rule 302(c)(21). (Zignago, K.)
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 7/14/2011 ORDERING that the 15 findings and recommendations filed June 20, 2011 are adopted in full. Plaintiff's 9 April 5, 2011 motion for default judgment is DENIED without prejudice as premature.(Duong, D)
|
June 20, 2011 |
Filing
15
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/18/11 RECOMMENDING that the 9 Motion for Default Judgment be denied without prejudice. Motion referred to Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Michel, G)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 5/23/2011 re 12 ORDERING that this action is hereby STAYED as to defendant Edith Silvina Salcedo, individuallyand d/b/a Silvinas Basket, only, pending disposition of Plaintiff's claims against this particular defendant in bankruptcy.(Duong, D)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?