Ahmed v. San Joaquin Regional Rail Commission
Plaintiff: Iqtadar Ahmed
Defendant: San Joaquin Regional Rail Commission
Case Number: 2:2010cv03069
Filed: November 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/27/12 RECOMMENDING that this action be dimissed without prejudice. Objections to these F&Rs due within 14 days; 33 Amended Complaint referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. (Benson, A.)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/26/12 ORDERING that defendant's 34 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with leave to amend within 30 days; defendant's 34 Motion for a more definite statement is DENIED as moot; the 35 01/04/12 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. (Benson, A.)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER AND ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 01/04/12 ORDERING that the hearing on defendant's 34 Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED to 02/22/12 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. B rennan. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, in writing, by 02/08/12 why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to the pending motion. Plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion, or a s tatement of non-opposition thereto, by 02/08/12. Failure of plaintiff to file an opposition will be deemed a statement of non-opposition to the pending motion, and may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with court orders and this court's Local Rules. Defendant may file a reply to plaintiff's opposition, if any, by 02/15/12. (Benson, A.)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/31/11: Defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint is granted with leave to amend. Defendant's motion for a more definite statement is denied as moot 27 . Plain tiff has thirty days from the date this order issues to file a second amended complaint. The status (pretrial scheduling) conference RESET for 3/14/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The parties shall file status reports on or before February 29, 2012. The September 19, 2011 order to show cause is discharged 28 . (Kaminski, H)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/19/2011 ORDERING that the hearing on Dft's 27 Motion to Dismiss is CONTINUED to 11/2/2011. Pltf shall SHOW CAUSE, no later than 10/19/2011, why sanctions should no t be imposed for failure to file an opposition to the pending motion. Pltf shall file an opposition to the motion, or a statement of non-opposition thereto, no later than 10/19/2011. Dft may file a reply to Pltf's opposition, if any, on or before 10/26/2011. (Zignago, K.)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/1/11 GRANTING 24 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has until 8/15/11 to file an amended complaint. The status conference scheduled for 8/17/11 is RESCHEDULED for 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. On or before 12/7/11, the parties shall file status reports addressing the matters referenced in the court's 11/23/2010 order. (Donati, J)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/7/11 GRANTING 8 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) with leave to amend as provided herein and DENYING as moot 8 Motion for a more definite statement. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. (Donati, J)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/31/11 ORDERING the hearing on 8 MOTION to DISMISS is RESET for 3/2/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than 2/16/11, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to the pending motion. Opposition or non-opposition to the motion is due no later than 2/16/11. Defendant may file a reply to plaintiff's opposition, if any, on or before 2/23/11. (Donati, J)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/23/2010 GRANTING planitiff's 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk directed to issue all process pursuant to FRCP 4 and to send plaintiff 1 USM-285 form, 1 Summons, a copy of 11/15/2010 Complaint and "new case" documents. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed v. San Joaquin Regional Rail Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iqtadar Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin Regional Rail Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?