August 25, 2016 |
Filing
164
ORDER signed by District Judge Susan Oki Mollway on 8/25/16 ORDERING that KIA is entitled to $2,381.45 as costs ($350.00 for fees of the clerk, $1320.15 for fees for deposition transcripts, $691.30 for witness fees, and $20.00 for docket fees). (Becknal, R)
|
January 19, 2016 |
Filing
124
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/19/16 ORDERING that the 2/22/2016 Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 6/27/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr..(Dillon, M)
|
May 11, 2015 |
Filing
119
CIVIL TRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/8/2015 ORDERING the plaintiffs to serve Kia Motors America, Inc. with notice identifying any Designated Document(s) they intend to move into evidence or include in a filing to this Court at least 48 hours before the proposed motion or filing. (Michel, G.)
|
January 28, 2015 |
Filing
64
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/28/15: IT IS ORDERED the jury trial is VACATED and CONTINUED to 6/29/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. The parties shall file tr ial briefs not later than 4/30/15. Final Pretrial Conference is VACATED and CONTINUED to 5/14/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr; Joint Final Pretrial Statement due not later than 4/23/15. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 4/23/15; oppositions due 4/30/15; replies due 5/7/15. Motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. (Meuleman, A)
|
March 27, 2014 |
Filing
61
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/25/14: Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 3/5/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Jury Trial RESET for 4/27/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
|
January 18, 2013 |
Filing
58
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/17/13 STRIKING 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Manzer, C)
|
October 27, 2011 |
Filing
46
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/26/11 ORDERING the Jury Trial reset for 4/8/13 at 09:00 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/13 at 02:00 PM; the Joint Final Pretrial Statement is due not later than 1/31/13, Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 1/31/13. Oppositions must be filed by 2/7/13, and any reply must be filed by 2/14/13. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference.(Becknal, R)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/29/11 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoena for Robinson Construction's Telephone Records from Pacific Bell and for Protective Order and/or Modification of Subpoena for L isa Robinson's Telephone Records from Nextel Communications, is withdrawn. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoena for Robinson Construction's Telephone Records from Pacific Bell and for Protective Order and/or Modification of Subpoena for Lisa Robinson's Telephone Records from Nextel Communications, scheduled for September 15, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., is Vacated. (Becknal, R)
|
September 6, 2011 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/6/11 ORDERING that plaintiffs' ex parte application for an order shortening time 37 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion to quash and for protective order and/or modification of subpoena 34 , is SET for 9/15/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Any response to the motion shall be filed by 9/8/11. Plaintiffs shall file any reply by 9/12/11. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order on the subpoenaed third parties. (Kastilahn, A)
|
June 13, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/13/2011 DENYING 25 plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoenas. (Reader, L)
|
April 15, 2011 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/14/11 ORDERING 7 Motion for Summary Adjudication is DENIED. (Carlos, K)
|
March 9, 2011 |
Filing
19
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/9/11 ORDERING discovery due 11/23/11; disclosure of expert witnesses due no later than 1/24/12; dispositive motions shall be filed by 3/22/12; final pretrial conference set for 7/ 26/12 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr..; jury trial is set for 9/24/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr..; this pretrial scheduling order will become final without further order unless objections are filed within 7 court days of service of this order. (Carlos, K)
|
March 8, 2011 |
Filing
18
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/7/2011 ORDERING 7 Motion Hearing on Summary Adjudication reset for 4/7/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Reader, L)
|
March 4, 2011 |
Filing
15
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/4/11. (Matson, R)
|