February 20, 2014 |
Filing
104
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/20/14 re: 103 regarding costs and final settlement. (Meuleman, A)
|
November 13, 2012 |
Filing
87
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/13/2012 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing as to 77 , 78 Motions for Summary Judgment to 12/21/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Michel, G)
|
October 29, 2012 |
Filing
83
ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/29/12 ORDERING that the motion for summary judgment hearing is RESCHEDULED for 11/16/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton.(Kastilahn, A)
|
September 18, 2012 |
Filing
76
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/13/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff and Defendants, by and through their respective counsel, hereby stipulate and agree to a 40 page limit or less when images are incorporated, but which does not exceed 30 pages without such images, subject to the Courts approval. (Becknal, R)
|
August 29, 2012 |
Filing
73
ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/28/2012 ORDERING that the parties' 48 , 54 cross-motions for summary judgment are DENIED without prejudice. The parties are instructed that any motion or cross-motion for summary judgment they wish to file shall be filed no later than 30 days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
|
July 25, 2012 |
Filing
69
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/24/2012 ORDERING that the 65 Markman hearing is CONTINUED to 8/8/2012 at 10:00 a.m. The pretrial and trial dates are VACATED, to be reset upon resolution of the Markman hearing. (Zignago, K.)
|
May 16, 2012 |
Filing
63
ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/15/2012 ORDERING the hearing on motions, currently scheduled for 5/21/2012 is hereby VACATED 48 , 54 ; plaintiff shall submit a supplemental memorandum no later than 6/4/2012; defendant shall, no later than 6/18/2012, either: file a statement that it has no objection to the claim construction offered by plaintiff and requesting this motion to be restored to the calendar, or notice a claim construction ("Markman") hearing in accordance with the court's local rules governing noticed motions. (Reader, L)
|
April 11, 2012 |
Filing
53
ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/11/2012 ORDERING that the Court has reviewed Defendants Kmart Corporation and Big Lots Stores, Inc.'s ("Defendants") 51 ex parte application for an order permitting Defendants to file a memorandum in support of their motion for summary judgment that is in excess of thirty pages when certain drawings and images are incorporated. After reviewing the ex parte application, the Declaration of Paul L. Gale, and the records and pleadings on file, and good cause appearing therefor, the Court GRANTS the application and hereby permits Defendants to file a memorandum in support of their motion for summary judgment that does not exceed 40 pages when images are incorporated, but which does not exceed 30 pages without such images. (Zignago, K.)
|
March 27, 2012 |
Filing
50
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/27/12 ORDERING defendants to file their Motion for Summary Judgment on 4/13/12; Defendants' opposition to Sofpool's previously filed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment will be due 4/17/12; Sofpool's opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment will be due 5/1/12; Sofpool's and Defendants' replies will both be due May 11, 2012; Sofpool's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be both heard on May 21, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4. (Meuleman, A)
|
February 13, 2012 |
Filing
45
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CLARIFICATION OF EXPERT REPORT DEADLINES AND DESIGNATIONS 41 signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/13/12. (Matson, R)
|
December 16, 2011 |
Filing
40
STIPULATION and ORDER TO MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/15/2011 ORDERING that the provisions of the Protective Order, §§ 7.2(b), (f)(ii), and (g), and 7.3(b), (f)(ii), and (g) shall not apply to docu ments, information, or objects produced by Intex in response to the Subpoena or otherwise. Namely, documents that Intex designates as "Highly Confidential - Attorneys' Eyes Only" shall not be disclosed to persons otherwise permitted ac cess to such Protected Material under the foregoing identified provisions of the Protective Order. To lower Intex's burden in complying with the Subpoena, confidentiality designations can be made on a document by document basis, as opposed to a page or partial page basis. (Zignago, K.)
|
August 9, 2011 |
Filing
37
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/8/11. (Matson, R)
|
June 10, 2011 |
Filing
34
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 6/9/11 ORDERING that defendants' responses to plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents and Interrogatories are due on or before 7/13/11. (Becknal, R)
|
April 6, 2011 |
Filing
26
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/6/11. Defendants have agreed to waive personal service on Big Lots Stores, Inc. of the First Amended Complaint, filed and electronically served on counsel for all Defendants on 3/3 1/11 24 . Defendants have until 5/2/2011 to answer the First Amended Complaint. By entering into this stipulation, neither of the parties limits or waives in any way their rights, claims or defenses, all of which are expressly reserved. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
January 11, 2011 |
Filing
10
STIPULATION and ORDER 9 for continuance signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/11/2011. Status Conference is RE-SET for 3/7/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK). Parties are reminded of their obligation to file Status Reports 14 days prior to hearing. (Marciel, M)
|