United States of America v. Approximately $19,700.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $19,700.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2010cv03382
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/6/11. (Kaminski, H)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/04/11 RECOMMENDING that the United States' motion for default judgment and final judgment of forfeiture be granted; that a judgment by default be entered against any right, title, or interest of potential claimants Bruce Langford, Theresa Langford, and John Brannon in the defendant currency referenced in the above caption; that a final judgment be entered, forfeiting all right, title, and interest in the defenda nt currency to the U.S., to be disposed of according to law; that the Default Judgment and Final Judgment of Forfeiture lodged herein be signed by the Honorable Morrison C. England, Jr. and filed by the Clerk of the Court. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Benson, A.)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/22/10. (Manzer, C)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/20/2010 ORDERING the Clerk to issue a warrant for arrest of articles in rem for the defendant currency. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $19,700.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David Taylor Shelledy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $19,700.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?