Gordon v Vitalis Partners LLC
Defendant: |
Vitalis Partners, LLC |
Creditor: |
Ben Gordon and G7, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2010mc00070 |
Filed: |
June 25, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Kendall J. Newman |
Presiding Judge: |
William B. Shubb |
Nature of Suit: |
Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause of Action: |
Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 9, 2012 |
Filing
79
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/08/12 ORDERING that the 77 Stipulation and Proposed Order is DENIED without prejudice to refiling. Within 30 days, the parties may file supplemental briefing addressing each of the foregoin g issues, and, if they think it necessary, they may file an amended Stipulation. If the parties conclude that the Stipulation would be more appropriately filed before the assigned United States District Judge, the parties may refile the Stipulation before Judge Shubb. (Benson, A.)
|
May 16, 2012 |
Filing
70
ORDER for APPEARANCE and EXAMINATION as to Custodian of Records for Morgan Stanley Smith Barney ("Custodian") signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/16/2012. The Custodian shall appear on 7/9/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) to furnish information aiding the enforcement of Judgment againtst Larry Harmon. (Marciel, M)
|
May 8, 2012 |
Filing
65
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/7/12 GRANTING 48 Motion to Charge Partner's Interest. (Meuleman, A)
|
January 18, 2012 |
Filing
39
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/17/12, ORDERING that plaintiffs's 29 Application does not conform with the California Code of Civil Procedure, and the Application is DENIED without prejudice. (Kastilahn, A)
|
December 2, 2011 |
Filing
26
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/2/2011 CONTINUING Motion Hearing as to 19 Motion to Amend the Judgment until 2/9/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing due by 1/12/2012; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing due by 1/26/2012; Plaintiffs' Reply Briefing due by 2/2/2012. (Michel, G)
|
January 4, 2011 |
Filing
13
STIPULATION and ORDER 12 re Appearance for Examination Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/4/2011. Judgment Debtor Exam is CONTINUED to 1/28/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN). (Marciel, M)
|
December 16, 2010 |
Filing
10
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/15/2010 ORDERING that defendant and judgment debtor Larry W. Harmon shall appear personally on 1/10/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman, to answer q uestions conceerning real and personal property. NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR. IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AT THE TIME AND PLACE SPECIFIED IN THIS ORDER, YOU MAY BE SUBJECT TO ARREST AND PUNISHMENT FOR CONTEMPT OF COURT AND THE COURT MAY MAKE AN ORDER REQUIRING YOU TO PAY THE REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES INCURRED BY THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR IN THIS PROCEEDING. (Reader, L)
|
December 6, 2010 |
Filing
6
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/3/2010 ORDERING 4 , 5 , that plaintiff's Applications are DENIED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Reader, L)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?