United States of America et al v. Hall
Petitioner: United States of America and R. L. Willett
Respondent: Rodney W. Hall
Case Number: 2:2010mc00101
Filed: October 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/7/11 ORDERING that the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations RE I.R.S Summons Enforcement, filed 1/14/11 9 are ADOPTED in full. The I.R.S. Summons issued to respondent, Rodney W. Hall, is ENF ORCED. Respondent, Rodney W. Hall, is ORDERED to appear at the I.R.S offices at 4830 Busness Center Drive, Suite 250, Fairfield, California 94534, before Revenue Officer R. L. Willett, or her designated reresentative, at a time and date to be set in writing by Revenue Officer R. L. Willett, then and there to be sworn, to give testimony, and to produce for examining and copying the books, checks, records, papers and other data demanded by the summons, the examination to continue from day to day until completed. The Court retains jurisdiction for further proceedings should they bocome necessary. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/14/2001 RECOMMENDING The IRS summons issued to respondent, Rodney W. Hall, be enforced. Although the parties' agreed upon date for meeting will occur prior to the exp iration of the objection period that pertains to these F & R's, respondent be ordered to appear at the IRS offices at 4830 Business Ctr. Dr., Suite 250, Fairfield, CA, before Revenue Officer R. L. Willett, or her designated representative, on 1/ 24/ 2011, at 10:30 AM, or at a later date to be set in writing by Revenue Officer Willett, then and there to be sworn, to give testimony, and to produce for examining and copying the books, checks, records, papers and other data demanded by the summo ns, the examination to continue from day to day until completed. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve these F & R's, and any future orders, by mail to Mr. Rodney W. Hall,; these F & R's are submitted to the US District Judge assigned to the case. Objections due 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/1/2010 ORDERING 3 Show Cause Hearing reset for 1/13/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. As stated in the OSC, if the respondent has any defense o r opposition to the petition, such defense or opposition shall be made in writing and filed with the Clerk, and a copy served on the USA, at least 14 days prior to the date set for the show cause hearing. All of the remaining provisions contained in the order to show cause shall remain in effect. (Reader, L)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/8/2010 SHOW CAUSE HEARING set for 12/9/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; Proof of any service shall be filed with the Clerk of this Court at least 14 days prior to the date set for the show cause hearing; the respondent may notify the Court, in writing filed with the Clerk and served on the USA at least 14 days prior to the date set for the show cause hearing, that the respondent has no objections to enforcement of the summons. The respondent's appearance at the hearing will then be excused.(Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Yoshinori H. T. Himel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: R. L. Willett
Represented By: Yoshinori H. T. Himel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rodney W. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?