United States of America v. Real property located at 15340 Old Toll Road, Camtonville, California, APN: 064-210-032
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real property located at 15340 Old Toll Road, Camtonville, California, APN: 064-210-032
Case Number: 2:2011cv00091
Filed: January 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 12/19/11. the Court finds that there was reasonable cause for the posting of the defendant real property, and for the commencement and prosecution of this forfeiture action, and a Certificate of Reasonable Cause pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2465 is hereby entered. (Kastilahn, A)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/31/11 ORDERING that the default entered herein on 3/29/11, be set aside, and the responsive pleadings submitted to the court on 6/29/11, on behalf of real party be filed by the Clerk. (Becknal, R)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 08/02/11 ORDERING that the hearing on the 19 Motion to Set Aside Default is CONTINUED to 09/16/11 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr.; the opposition is due 09/02/11.(Benson, A.)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/09/11 GRANTING Order for Publication. (Williams, D)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 2/4/11: This case is related with case CIV. S-11-0099 FCD KJN and CIV. S-11-0320 JAM KJN. (Kaminski, H)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 1/13/2011 ORDERING that case 2:11-cv-0091 FCD is related with member of case 2:11-cv-0099 MCE KJN. (Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real property located at 15340 Old Toll Road, Camtonville, California, APN: 064-210-032
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David Taylor Shelledy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property located at 15340 Old Toll Road, Camtonville, California, APN: 064-210-032
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?